Innovation Ventures LLC et al v. Pittsburg Wholesale Grocers Inc et al
Plaintiff: Innovation Ventures LLC and Living Essentials LLC
Defendant: Jacumba Shell, United Custom Distributors LLC, Steven Milakofsky, Pittsburg Wholesale Grocers Inc, Pacific Groservice Inc, Aristotle Pericles Navab, David Luttway, Santa Monica Distributing Inc, Manouchehr Heikali, Aziz Heikali, Elite Wholesale Inc, Tonic Wholesale Inc, Dapan USA Corp, Sung Keun Lee, Dan-Dee Company Inc, Fadi Attiq, Kevin Attiq and Rahib, Goldberg & Associates Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv05523
Filed: October 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BETWEEN DAN-DEE COMPANY, INC. AND THE ELITE WHOLESALE PARTIES re 521 . Signed by Judge Alsup on November 19, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION DISMISSING ELITE DEFENDANTS' CROSS-CLAIMS by Hon. William Alsup granting 523 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS THIRD PARTY CLAIMS (DKT. NO. 504) by Hon. William Alsup granting 504 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER GRANTING IN PART REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM SEALING ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 476 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 477 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (1/13,2014) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (1/6/2014). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/21/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 461) by Hon. William Alsup denying 461 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER Granting permission for Elizabeth Carter to appear by telelphone at the 11/8/2013 Settlement Conference re 470 Proposed Order, filed by Innovation Ventures LLC, Living Essentials LLC, 469 Letter, filed by Innovation Ventures LLC, Living Essentials LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/15/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER CHANGING HEARING DATE re 450 MOTION Authorization to Disburse Salaries filed by Dan-Dee Company Inc, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 450 MOTION Authorization to Disburse Salaries .. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 10, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED RELEASE FROM SEIZURE BOND by Hon. William Alsup granting 454 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 456 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Motions terminated: 447 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Discovery filed by Dan-Dee Company Inc, 455 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 447 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Discovery filed by Dan-Dee Company Inc.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/7/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REQUESTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup granting 449 Motion for Hearing.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS ON DAN-DEES FIRST, SECOND, AND THIRD AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Hon. William Alsup granting 421 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 439 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF PITCO DEFENDANTS by Hon. William Alsup granting 437 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 429 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED ORDER re 427 Stipulation Governing Outstanding Discovery Issues Between Dan-Dee Company, Inc. and Innovation Ventures, LLC, Living Essentials, LLC, and International IP Holdings, LLC. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/24/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER REGARDING PARTIES' JULY 16, 2013 JOINT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/17/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER REGARDING ANY UNRESOLVED DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Update, if any, due by 7/16/2013. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/12/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 414 Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/10/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 7/15/2013.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/08/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE AND REFERRAL OF ALL DISCOVERY DISPUTES TO A RANDOMLY-ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 389 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part 391 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part 398 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part 399 Discovery Letter Brief (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE CORRESPONDENCE by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 392 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARINGS AND MEET-AND-CONFER [re 389 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Pacific Groservice Inc, Pittsburg Wholesale Grocers Inc, 391 Discovery Letter BriefRe: Plaintiffs' Refusal to Provide Request ed Information and Documents filed by Dan-Dee Company Inc.]. Responses due by NOON ON 7/2/2013. Two separate two-hour meet-and-confer 7/3/2013 from 9:00--11:00 AM in Court's jury rooms. Discovery Hearing set for 7/3/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/28/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO PARTIALLY DISMISS CROSSCLAIM by Hon. William Alsup granting 378 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 370 Discovery Letter Brief.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING RE DEFENDANTS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 370 Discovery Letter Brief for discovery relief filed by Pacific Groservice Inc, Pittsburg Wholesale Grocers Inc.]. Responses due by noon on 6/14/2013. Thre e-hour meet-and-confer from 10:00 am--1:30 pm (thirty minutes off at noon for lunch) on 6/17/2013. Discovery Hearing set for 6/17/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/12/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO USE DEPOSITION TESTIMONY by Hon. William Alsup granting 340 Motion Use deposition testimony.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS CROSS CLAIMS by Hon. William Alsup finding as moot 333 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER GRANTING LeBeau PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 346 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER GRANTING CONSENT JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting 342 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER GRANTING CONSENT JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting 323 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting 275 Motion to Strike]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER GRANTING AKKASHIAN PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 299 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY ADAM BLUMENKRANTZ by Hon. William Alsup denying 239 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO VACATE HEARING by Hon. William Alsup finding as moot 226 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER GRANTING CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Hon. William Alsup granting 274 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 252 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013) Modified on 3/20/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Hon. William Alsup granting 261 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 155 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 177 Motion for Joinder (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS by Hon. William Alsup granting 246 Ex Parte Application.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER GRANTING REQUESTS TO WITHDRAW MOTION AND FOR LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Alsup withdrawing 191 Motion to Strike ; granting 202 Stipulation (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Alsup granting 156 Motion to Strike ; granting 178 Motion for Joinder (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER POSTPONING HEARING re 86 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Pacific Groservice Inc, Pittsburg Wholesale Grocers Inc, 125 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or Stay Pitco Foods' Pending Motion for Sanctions filed by Innovation Ventures LLC, Living Essentials LLC, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 86 MOTION for Sanctions , 125 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or Stay Pitco Foods' Pending Motion for Sanctions. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Status Report due by 3/14/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 29, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE re 86 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Pacific Groservice Inc, Pittsburg Wholesale Grocers Inc, 125 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or Stay Pitco Foods' Pending Motion for Sanctions filed by Innovation Ventures LLC, Living Essentials LLC (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
December 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Hon. William Alsup denying 70 Motion for Reconsideration.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2012)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION re 102 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Santa Monica Distributing Inc (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER UNSEALING ACTION (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER # 64 . Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/2012. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovation Ventures LLC et al v. Pittsburg Wholesale Grocers Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacumba Shell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Custom Distributors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Milakofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittsburg Wholesale Grocers Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Taylor
Represented By: Wendy M. Garbers
Represented By: Mark W Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Groservice Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristotle Pericles Navab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Luttway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Monica Distributing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manouchehr Heikali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aziz Heikali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Wholesale Inc
Represented By: Randolph Gaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonic Wholesale Inc
Represented By: Randolph Gaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dapan USA Corp
Represented By: Randolph Gaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sung Keun Lee
Represented By: Randolph Gaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan-Dee Company Inc
Represented By: William A. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fadi Attiq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Attiq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rahib, Goldberg & Associates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovation Ventures LLC
Represented By: Christos G Yatrakis
Represented By: Bryan Leland Patrick Saalfeld
Represented By: Geoffrey Potter
Represented By: Aaron K. McClellan
Represented By: Thomas Philip Mazzucco
Represented By: Nicholas C Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Living Essentials LLC
Represented By: Bryan Leland Patrick Saalfeld
Represented By: Aaron K. McClellan
Represented By: Thomas Philip Mazzucco
Represented By: Nicholas C Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?