Laygo et al v. World Savings Bank et al
Plaintiff: Teresito M. Laygo, Teresito Joselito Catalan and Andrea C. Laygo
Defendant: Golden West Savings Association Service Company and World Savings Bank
Case Number: 3:2012cv05531
Filed: October 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE; ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/28/2013. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that case be reassigned to a district court judge; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The March 28, 2013 show cause hearing is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/27/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE & VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING SET FOR MARCH 7, 2013. Show Cause Response due by 3/21/2013. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/28/2013 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/5/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laygo et al v. World Savings Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden West Savings Association Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresito M. Laygo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresito Joselito Catalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea C. Laygo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?