Cassiman v. Petersen et al
Plaintiff: Ian Cassiman
Defendant: Ryan Petersen, Arthur F. Knapp, Jr., Ralph H. Schmitt, Adam J Epstein, Richard L. Hunter, Russell J Knittel and OCZ Technology Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv05556
Filed: October 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SUA SPONTE REFERRAL ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. This matter is referred to the Honorable Richard Seeborg for the purpose of considering whether it is related to the following cases: In re OCZ Technology Group. Inc. Shareholder Derivative Litigation, C-12-5556 RS and C-12-5265 RS. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/17/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING DERIVATIVE SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE. Settlement Hearing set for 10/17/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/5/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/8/2013 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/3013. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CONSOLIDATED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/11/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CONSOLIDATED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/25/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/18/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/1/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 16 VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/23/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS AND RELATED MATTERS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/14/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cassiman v. Petersen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Cassiman
Represented By: George Carlos Aguilar
Represented By: Michael J. Nicoud
Represented By: Lauren N. Ochenduszko
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur F. Knapp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph H. Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam J Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell J Knittel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCZ Technology Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?