August 22, 2016 |
Filing
264
ORDER DENYING 243 MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Judge William H. Orrick. Thought was required to file a declaration in support of its 242 sealing motion. If Thought wants to keep Exhibit G sealed, within four days of the date of this Order, Thought must submit a declaration establishing good cause for the continued sealing. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
|
July 18, 2016 |
Filing
252
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 243 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle International Corporation, Oracle Corporation. Motion Hearing reset for 8/24/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 7/16/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
|
June 13, 2016 |
Filing
234
ORDER ON 202 , 205 SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William H. Orrick. Summary judgment of non-infringement is GRANTED to Oracle. Oracle's counterclaim seeking a declaratory judgment that the '197 patent is invalid is dismissed without prejudice. The order also addresses 208 Motion to Strike and 204 , 207 , 208 , 210 , 212 , 216 , and 224 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
|
October 30, 2015 |
Filing
190
STIPULATION AND ORDER - Discovery cutoff: 11/6/2015. Dispositive motions to be hear by 4/20/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/30/2015. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
|
October 27, 2015 |
Filing
187
Discovery Order re: 185 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Certain Discovery Requests Objections Made By Oracle. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/27/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
|
October 7, 2015 |
Filing
176
ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO STRIKE INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Judge William H. Orrick granting 161 and 163 Motion to Strike. Thought's amended infringement contentions and Oracle's amended invalidity content ions are STRUCK, as are Thought's supplemental responses to Oracle's interrogatories. The parties shall each submit a brief of no more than 5 pages on their respective positions regarding the construction of the term "object name." Oracle shall file its brief by October 14, 2015 (fourteen days from the date of the hearing), and Thought shall file its brief by October 28, 2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
|
September 11, 2015 |
Filing
167
AMENDED CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/11/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
|
September 1, 2015 |
Filing
164
ORDER GRANTING IN PART 162 JOINT MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR COURT TO HEAR MOTIONS TO STRIKE - Reset Deadlines as to 161 MOTION to Strike and 163 MOTION to Strike. Response due by 9/11/2015. Reply due by 9/16/2015. Motion Hearings set for 9/30/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. The parties may discuss the implications of the hearing date on the rest of the case schedule at the Case Management Conference on September 8, 2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/01/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
|
August 28, 2015 |
Filing
160
Discovery Order re: Dkt. No. 159 Thought's Discovery Letter Regarding Certain Discovery Request Objections Made By Oracle. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/28/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
|
August 14, 2015 |
Filing
154
ORDER GRANTING THOUGHT'S NON-CONTESTED MOTION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE re 153 Consent MOTION to Continue. Case Management Conference continued to 9/8/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/14/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
|
May 15, 2015 |
Filing
143
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 139 Motion. The Court AFFIRMS Magistrate Judge James' order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
|
April 24, 2015 |
Filing
140
BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON 139 MOTION FOR RELIEF - Oracle shall file a five page response on or before April 30, 2015, and the matter will be taken under submission. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/24/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
|
April 9, 2015 |
Filing
138
Discovery Order re 137 Letter filed by Thought, Inc. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/9/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
|
December 29, 2014 |
Filing
134
CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/29/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2014)
|
December 16, 2014 |
Filing
131
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 124 Motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
|
December 3, 2014 |
Filing
126
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Hon. William H. Orrick re 114 Motion. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
|
November 5, 2014 |
Filing
123
ORDER granting 120 Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference and Modifying Other Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2014. Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/05/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
|
October 22, 2014 |
Filing
116
CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/22/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
|
August 11, 2014 |
Filing
112
Discovery Order re: 111 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/11/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
|
July 31, 2014 |
Filing
110
Discovery Order re: Dkt. No. 109. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/31/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
|
June 30, 2014 |
Filing
104
ORDER TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION. Defendant shall e-file the Supplemental Declaration of Anthony Hosking, submitted to the Court during the June 27, 2014 Markman hearing. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/30/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
|
April 14, 2014 |
Filing
86
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION REQUESTING THE RESCHEDULING OF MARKMAN TUTORIAL re 77 MOTION to Continue. Tutorial Hearing set for 6/24/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/14/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
|
December 30, 2013 |
Filing
67
ORDER RE NUMBER OF TERMS THE COURT WILL CONSTRUE AND ASSOCIATED PROCEDURES FOR THE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING AND HEARING re 66 Joint MOTION.Tutorial Hearing set for 6/20/2014 09:00 AM and Claims Construction Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM, both in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/30/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
|
November 14, 2013 |
Filing
58
ORDER re 54 MOTION for Reconsideration. The Court is inclined to GRANT the motion for clarification. If Thought wishes to comment on that motion or the Court's current intention, Thought shall file a response of no more than five (5) pages on or before Wednesday November 20, 2013. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/14/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
|
November 12, 2013 |
Filing
57
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND SCHEDULE FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DISCLOSURES re 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/12/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
|
October 10, 2013 |
Filing
50
ORDER GRANTING 42 MOTION TO LIMIT CLAIMS by Judge William H. Orrick. Thought shall make a Preliminary Election of Asserted Claims, identifying no more than 10 claims per patent and no more than 32 claims total to pursue pre-Claim Construction, b y October 21, 2013. By November 4, 2013, Oracle shall make a Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art, selecting the 18 prior art references it will assert against each Thought patent, with no more than 50 total. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
|
July 18, 2013 |
Filing
39
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Defendants' Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/18/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
|
May 7, 2013 |
Filing
32
ORDER GRANTING 30 STIPULATION Regarding E-Discovery. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/7/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
|
December 4, 2012 |
Filing
9
ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/4/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
|