Alvarez v. Sonoma County et al
Plaintiff: Javier A. Alvarez
Defendant: Exchange Bank, Megan Frances Alvarez, Sonoma County, Julie S. Paik, Lisa M. Cervantes, Anna New and Jan C. Sturla
Case Number: 3:2012cv05606
Filed: November 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 Stipulated Request to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and [Proposed] Order filed by S. Sullivan, Julie S. Paik, Javier Agusto Alvarez, Sr., Anna New, Laurie B. Lapidus, Sonoma County. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/23/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 27 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ALLOWING DEFENDANT MEGAN ALVAREZ FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING (Copy mailed to Plaintiff and e-mailed to Megan Alvarez). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/4/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/3/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez v. Sonoma County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exchange Bank
Represented By: Richard William Abbey
Represented By: Bryan Coryell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Frances Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoma County
Represented By: Richard William Osman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie S. Paik
Represented By: Richard William Osman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa M. Cervantes
Represented By: Richard William Osman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna New
Represented By: Richard William Osman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan C. Sturla
Represented By: Jennifer C. Addams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier A. Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?