Stamps v. Grounds
Petitioner: Keith Stamps
Respondent: Randy Grounds
Case Number: 3:2012cv05753
Filed: November 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 64 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Application for Extension of Time to File Response to OSC.Answer due by 2/28/2019. Traverse due no later than thrity (30) days of receipt of the answer. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER OF INSTRUCTION REGARDING COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW re 59 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney with Proposed Order filed by Keith Stamps. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/1/2018. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER TERMINATING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL DAVID L. PLOTSKY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/5/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING 45 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AND TERMINATING AS MOOT MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/6/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 43 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR COURT ORDERED UNMONITORED NONCOLLECT PRESCHEDULED TELEPHONE CALL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/31/2016.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REINSTATING STAY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/17/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO REOPEN AND REQUIRING STATUS UPDATE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PETITIONER'S MOTION TO REOPEN. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ON 29 REMAND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/2/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING [26-1] PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/6/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/29/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; NOTICE OF IMMINENT DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/29/2015. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE STATUS UPDATE. Status report due by 6/19/2015. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 6/2/2015. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/20/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE FURTHER STATUS UPDATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/3/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re Status Report Due APRIL 3, 2014. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/3/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014) Modified on 2/3/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SECOND ORDER RE STATUS UPDATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/27/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re 11 Status Report filed by Keith Stamps. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/15/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE AMENDED PETITION AND TO STAY AND ABATE by Judge William Alsup [granting 5 Motion to Stay; granting 6 Motion to Amend/Correct]; Petitioner is required to E-FILE the amended document. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MOTION TO STAY. Show cause response due by 1/29/13 at noon. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/8/13. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
December 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE MOTION TO AMEND re 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Keith Stamps (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. RESPONSE DUE BY 12/17/2012. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/3/12. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stamps v. Grounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keith Stamps
Represented By: Donald Thomas Bergerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randy Grounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?