Daniels v. Aeropostale West, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Portia Daniels
Defendant: Aeropostale West, Inc and Aeropostale, Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv05755
Filed: November 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:160(1) National Labor Relations Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 FIRST AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Jury Selection set for 8/18/2014 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 10, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF FLSA COLLECTIVE-ACTIONSETTLEMENT AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Alsup denying 51 Motion for Settlement; re 57 Stipulation (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE RE PRETRIAL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 21, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE RE PROPOSED FLSA SETTLEMENT. Response due noon on May 23, 2014.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 19, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REQUEST RE STATE-COURT ACTIONS AND DAMAGES. Response due by noon on May 15.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 6, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION by Judge William Alsup [granting 25 Motion to Certify Class]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REQUEST RE ORAL ARGUMENT [re 25 MOTION to Certify Class FOR ORDER GRANTING CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION AND FOR ORDER REGARDING MAILING OF OPT-IN NOTICE TO FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION MEMBERS filed by Portia Daniels]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/17/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Hon. William Alsup granting 31 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE REGARDING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT FACTORS (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/3/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Aeropostale West, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portia Daniels
Represented By: Torey Joseph Favarote
Represented By: Joseph R Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aeropostale West, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aeropostale, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?