Thio et al v. Genji, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nen Thio, Tju Tjin Liem and Denny Wijaya
Defendant: Genji, Inc, Genji, LLC and Genji Retail Support, Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv05756
Filed: November 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER RE PROPOSED ORDER. By August 26, 2014, at 3:00 p.m. Plaintiffs must file a copy of the proposed revised class notice and claim form highlighting all the changes made to the class notice and claim form approved by the Court. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/26/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting 37 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. The Court will hold a final approval hearing on December 3, 2014, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, U.S. District Court, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 27 . Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2013 is VACATED. Plaintiffs shall file their motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement by 8/28/2013, set for hearing 10/2/2013 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/23/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE 24 . Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/19/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thio et al v. Genji, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genji, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genji, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genji Retail Support, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nen Thio
Represented By: Abigail Ameri Treanor
Represented By: David S. Harris
Represented By: Alan Dale Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tju Tjin Liem
Represented By: Abigail Ameri Treanor
Represented By: David S. Harris
Represented By: Alan Dale Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denny Wijaya
Represented By: David S. Harris
Represented By: Alan Dale Harris
Represented By: Abigail Ameri Treanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?