Architectural Resources Group, Inc. et al v. HKS, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ideas Consulting, Inc. and Architectural Resources Group, Inc.
Defendant: HKS, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv05787
Filed: November 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Entire action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/12/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/20/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 47 48 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST THROUGH SIXTH CLAIMS OF COUNTER-COMPLAINT, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 28 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER and Stipulation for Third-Party Defendants George Loisos's, Susan Ubbelohde's, and Tipping Mar + Associates's Responses to HKS, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/22/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 18 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Architectural Resources Group, Inc. et al v. HKS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ideas Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Conrad-Charles Praetzellis
Represented By: Jonathan Steven O'Donnell
Represented By: Dwight Craig Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Architectural Resources Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Conrad-Charles Praetzellis
Represented By: Jonathan Steven O'Donnell
Represented By: Dwight Craig Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HKS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?