Cox v. Allin Corporation Plan et al
Plaintiff: Elgin K. Cox
Defendant: Allin Corporation Plan, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Dell, Inc. Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Dell, Inc. Administration and Investment Committee and Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv05880
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER REOPENING ACTIONS AND SETTING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2021 02:45 PM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 6/30/2021. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2021)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO AMEND JUDGMENT AND FOR ATTORNEYS FEES re 158 MOTION for Attorney Fees 157 MOTION to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/21/16. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Deadline for Plaintiff to File Reply Briefs re 158 Motion for Attorney's Fees and 157 Motion to Alter Judgment. Replies due by 12/10/2015. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 12/02/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STIPULATION AND ORDER re briefing schedule and hearing on 159 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2016 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/04/2015. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue the Deadlines as to 157 MOTION to Alter Judgment, and 158 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Responses due by 11/19/2015. Replies due by 12/3/2015. Signed by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong on 10/26/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER CLOSING FILE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/22/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 AMENDED ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF 109 AND DEFENDANTS' 101 RESPECTIVE MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING DEFENDANTS 119 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO RAISE ONE ADDITIONAL POINT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 115 Stipulation to Continue Deadline for Filings Responses to Motions for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration re 112 Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 113 Stipulation (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON ( 101 , 109 ) MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. (terminating 103 Motion to Appear by Telephone) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER VACATING Settlement Conference set for 11/14/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 110 Letter Brief, filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Elgin K. Cox, Allin Corporation Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/10/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 83 Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER REFERRING ACTION FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE to Magistrate Judge RYU for Settlement. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/29/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/7/2014 Granting 68 Stipulation CONTINUING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014) Modified on 1/8/2014 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Suandra Brwon Armstrong Granting 66 Stipulation CONTINUING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong (terminating 64 stipulation). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AMENDED ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION (Corrects date of Mediation). Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/31/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/21/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 60 Stipulation TO CONTINUE MEDIATION COMPLETION DEADLINE (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2013 02:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/19/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2013 03:15 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/14/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 15 Motion to Dismiss Without Leave to Amend, GRANTING 33 Motion to Dismiss Without Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 05/01/13. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: That Anna M. Martin of Rimac Martin, P.C. be substited in as counsel of record for Defendant Allin Corp. Group Life & Disability Plan, instead of and in place of C. Brandon Wisoff of Farella Braun and Martel LLP re 35 Notice of Substitution of Attorney. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 02/11/13. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 30 Stipulation (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT as do the Dell Related Entities. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/19/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME FOR DFTs AETNA LIFE AND DELL TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/11/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Allin Corporation Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elgin K. Cox
Represented By: Laurence Fred Padway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allin Corporation Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell, Inc. Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell, Inc. Administration and Investment Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?