Toscano v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin K. Toscano
Defendant: G. D. Lewis and Robert A. Horel
Case Number: 3:2012cv05893
Filed: November 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 408 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/11/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER re 397 Plaintiff's Letter, filed on October 4, 2017. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/05/2017. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 390 Administrative Request to Advance Hearing Date on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 386 WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued for Plaintiff's presence at the settlement conference on 10/6/2017 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 9/22/2017. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER re 370 Plaintiff's Reply. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 09/18/2017. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 367 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 366 Stipulation with Protective Order filed by D. Thompson, G. Eberly. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/21/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 358 WRIT of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum issued for Plaintiff's presence at the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 5/22/2017. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen re 354 Joint Discovery Letter of May 16, 2017. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 336 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 335 Notice of Settlement and Stipulated Request to Vacate Trial Date; [Proposed] Order filed by Benjamin K. Toscano Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/8/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 331 332 Plaintiff's Pro Se Motions. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toscano v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin K. Toscano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. D. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Horel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?