Buddy Media, Inc. v. The Buddy Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Buddy Media, Inc.
Defendant: The Buddy Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv05920
Filed: November 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statutes
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 5/17/13 is continued 7/19/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/16/13., Motions terminated: 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time of Case Management Conference and Deadline for Early Neutral Evaluation Session and [Proposed] Order filed by Buddy Media, Inc.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buddy Media, Inc. v. The Buddy Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buddy Media, Inc.
Represented By: John Lawrence Slafsky
Represented By: Matthew Jacob Kuykendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Buddy Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?