Yeh v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Jay Ta-Chieh Yeh
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A. and Green Tree Servicing LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv05940
Filed: November 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/7/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/16/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/26/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re 6 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Bank of America, N.A. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 12/12/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yeh v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Ta-Chieh Yeh
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Adelaars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Karen Palladino Ciccone
Represented By: Taylor L. Broadhead
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Thomas Nathaniel Abbott
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?