Soares v. Lorono et al
Plaintiff: Paul F. Soares
Defendant: Jeffrey Lorono, Modisystems, Tegola Canadese, Construction Chemicals Pty Ltd and Does 1 through 50
Case Number: 3:2012cv05979
Filed: November 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 396 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/07/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 384 Motion to Alter Judgment. Because Soares has failed to establish any of the requirements of Rule 60, his motion is DENIED. I clarify that SVR is the legal entity in this case and that Soares's de bt is owed to SVR. Defendants are entitled to reasonable attorneys fees incurred in defending this motion. Defendants' counsel should submit a declaration attaching his billing records, limited to his opposition to Soares's motion, by June 26, 2015. Soares may file any opposition by July 3, 2015, and I will issue a supplemental order thereafter. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER RE ATTORNEYS' FEES by Hon. William H. Orrick re 342 Motion for Attorney Fees. Soares owes Village a non-dischargeable debt of $14,517.36, plus interest. Soares owes SVR a non-dischargeable debt of $5,697.00, plus interest. I t also owes $39,512.00 in fees related to the civil proceeding and $29,756.00in prepetition fees, for a total of $69,268.00 in attorneys' fees.The defendants' bill of costs is deemed waived, and they are not entitled to any costs. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER DENYING 361 MOTION TO STAY EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT PENDING APPEAL AND DENYING 364 MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT OR FOR A NEW TRIAL by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER re 342 First MOTION for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/12/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER re 359 Emergency Motion filed by Paul F. Soares. Plaintiff may file motions by February 16, 2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/10/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015) Modified on 2/11/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER PROHIBITING FURTHER FILINGS UNTIL FURTHER ORDER. The author of any filing that is not an emergency will be sanctioned. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/16/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER CLARIFYING DENIAL OF JOINDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/24/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 276 Motion for Joinder. In response to defendants request for clarification, the Court will consider Soaress 297 motion in limine. Defendants may but are not required to file a response to this motion by November 19, 2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION IN LIMINE. Defendants are granted leave to file a motion in limine of no more than five pages by November 11, 2014. Plaintiff may file a response by November 17, 2014. Defendants may not file a reply. The matter will be addressed at the pretrial conference on November 21, 2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/04/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING re 260 Emergency MOTION to Shorten Time. Any response to Soares's arguments regarding the tentative settlement agreement with Rangel is due by 10/20/2014. Telephone Conference set for 10/22/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/16/2014. (Parties should contact the Courtroom Deputy to arrange for telephonic appearance.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 257 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/08/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 233 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The schedule listed in the Civil Pretrial Order remains in place, with the pretrial conference set for October 7, 2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES re 233 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and change other case deadlines. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/03/2014. Any defendant wishing to oppose the motion to extend deadlines must file its opposition brief by September 8, 2014. Soaress reply brief will be due September 11, 2014. The hearing remains set for September 17, 2014 at 2:00 pm. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/03/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge William H. Orrick granting 189 Motion to Dismiss and denying 202 Motion for Reconsideration. The motion to dismiss is GRANTED with LEAVE TO AMEND on the Second and Third Causes of Action. The motion is GRANTED with PREJUDICE to the extent the Second Cause of Action is based on violation of the Song-Beverly Act. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 20 days of the date of this order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 181 Motion to Compel. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR RESPONSE BY TEGOLA CANADESE, S.P.A. re 185 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/25/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING BILL OF COSTS re 183 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. The time period for Modi Systems, Inc. to file its Bill of Costs in this action is extended through December 16, 2013. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/22/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 118 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND GRANTING MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT 49 56 26 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER, Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/1/12 is continued 3/22/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/14/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, Attorney David M. Hollingsworth for Jeffrey Lorono added. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/18/12. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2012: # 1 Certificate of Service) (tlS, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/13/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soares v. Lorono et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul F. Soares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Lorono
Represented By: David M. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modisystems
Represented By: Barton Samuel Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tegola Canadese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Construction Chemicals Pty Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?