July 7, 2015 |
Filing
396
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/07/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
|
June 19, 2015 |
Filing
394
Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 384 Motion to Alter Judgment. Because Soares has failed to establish any of the requirements of Rule 60, his motion is DENIED. I clarify that SVR is the legal entity in this case and that Soares's de bt is owed to SVR. Defendants are entitled to reasonable attorneys fees incurred in defending this motion. Defendants' counsel should submit a declaration attaching his billing records, limited to his opposition to Soares's motion, by June 26, 2015. Soares may file any opposition by July 3, 2015, and I will issue a supplemental order thereafter. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
|
April 16, 2015 |
Filing
382
ORDER RE ATTORNEYS' FEES by Hon. William H. Orrick re 342 Motion for Attorney Fees. Soares owes Village a non-dischargeable debt of $14,517.36, plus interest. Soares owes SVR a non-dischargeable debt of $5,697.00, plus interest. I t also owes $39,512.00 in fees related to the civil proceeding and $29,756.00in prepetition fees, for a total of $69,268.00 in attorneys' fees.The defendants' bill of costs is deemed waived, and they are not entitled to any costs. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
|
March 18, 2015 |
Filing
378
ORDER DENYING 361 MOTION TO STAY EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT PENDING APPEAL AND DENYING 364 MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT OR FOR A NEW TRIAL by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
|
March 12, 2015 |
Filing
370
ORDER re 342 First MOTION for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/12/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
|
February 10, 2015 |
Filing
360
ORDER re 359 Emergency Motion filed by Paul F. Soares. Plaintiff may file motions by February 16, 2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/10/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015) Modified on 2/11/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
|
December 16, 2014 |
Filing
333
ORDER PROHIBITING FURTHER FILINGS UNTIL FURTHER ORDER. The author of any filing that is not an emergency will be sanctioned. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/16/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
|
November 24, 2014 |
Filing
313
ORDER CLARIFYING DENIAL OF JOINDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/24/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
|
November 17, 2014 |
Filing
306
Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 276 Motion for Joinder. In response to defendants request for clarification, the Court will consider Soaress 297 motion in limine. Defendants may but are not required to file a response to this motion by November 19, 2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
|
November 4, 2014 |
Filing
274
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION IN LIMINE. Defendants are granted leave to file a motion in limine of no more than five pages by November 11, 2014. Plaintiff may file a response by November 17, 2014. Defendants may not file a reply. The matter will be addressed at the pretrial conference on November 21, 2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/04/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
|
October 16, 2014 |
Filing
261
ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING re 260 Emergency MOTION to Shorten Time. Any response to Soares's arguments regarding the tentative settlement agreement with Rangel is due by 10/20/2014. Telephone Conference set for 10/22/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/16/2014. (Parties should contact the Courtroom Deputy to arrange for telephonic appearance.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
|
October 8, 2014 |
Filing
257
CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/08/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
|
September 17, 2014 |
Filing
242
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 233 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The schedule listed in the Civil Pretrial Order remains in place, with the pretrial conference set for October 7, 2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
|
September 3, 2014 |
Filing
238
ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES re 233 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and change other case deadlines. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/03/2014. Any defendant wishing to oppose the motion to extend deadlines must file its opposition brief by September 8, 2014. Soaress reply brief will be due September 11, 2014. The hearing remains set for September 17, 2014 at 2:00 pm. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
|
March 3, 2014 |
Filing
217
CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/03/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
|
February 25, 2014 |
Filing
211
ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge William H. Orrick granting 189 Motion to Dismiss and denying 202 Motion for Reconsideration. The motion to dismiss is GRANTED with LEAVE TO AMEND on the Second and Third Causes of Action. The motion is GRANTED with PREJUDICE to the extent the Second Cause of Action is based on violation of the Song-Beverly Act. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 20 days of the date of this order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
|
January 15, 2014 |
Filing
197
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 181 Motion to Compel. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
|
November 25, 2013 |
Filing
186
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR RESPONSE BY TEGOLA CANADESE, S.P.A. re 185 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/25/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
|
November 22, 2013 |
Filing
184
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING BILL OF COSTS re 183 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. The time period for Modi Systems, Inc. to file its Bill of Costs in this action is extended through December 16, 2013. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/22/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
|
June 12, 2013 |
Filing
128
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 118 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
|
February 8, 2013 |
Filing
94
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND GRANTING MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT 49 56 26 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
|
January 15, 2013 |
Filing
83
ORDER, Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/1/12 is continued 3/22/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/14/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
|
December 18, 2012 |
Filing
52
ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, Attorney David M. Hollingsworth for Jeffrey Lorono added. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/18/12. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2012: # 1 Certificate of Service) (tlS, COURT STAFF).
|
December 13, 2012 |
Filing
46
ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/13/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
|