Polk v. Cate et al
Petitioner: Susan Mae Polk
Respondent: Matthew Cate and Guillermo Garcia
Case Number: 3:2012cv05986
Filed: November 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Presiding Judge: PSLC JNE
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 186 Motion for relief from judgment.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 179 Motion for Relief From Final Judgment.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 168 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Motion to Amend or Alter Judgment.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 132 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polk v. Cate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Susan Mae Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Guillermo Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?