Jakub v. A.R.M. Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Guy Jakub
Defendant: James Montgomery, Brad Jadwin and A.R.M. Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv06113
Filed: December 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/21/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER Referring Case to Private Mediation. Case referred to Private ADR and Court sponsored mediation is withdrawn. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 09/10/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 8 Motion to Strike.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jakub v. A.R.M. Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Jadwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.R.M. Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Jakub
Represented By: Kristen Gelinas Simplicio
Represented By: Seth Adam Safier
Represented By: Adam Gutride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?