Technology Licensing Company, Inc. v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Technology Licensing Company, Inc.
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv06124
Filed: December 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2014 Filing 59 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 57 Proposed Order filed by Technology Licensing Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/21/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 20, 2014 Filing 57 Proposed Order of Dismissal by Technology Licensing Company, Inc.. (Carpenter, John) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 56 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/16/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 54 Joint MOTION TO STAY CASE DEADLINES/NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Damstedt, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/15/2014) Modified on 1/16/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2014 Filing 53 CLERKS NOTICE re deficiency of document 52 (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 14, 2014 Filing 52 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. OF SETTLEMENT AND JOINT MOTION TO STAY CASE DEADLINES (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Damstedt, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 51 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 50 Motion for Extension of Time to File. FINAL CONTINUANCE. NO FURTHER REQUESTS WILL BE GRANTED.(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 50 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Under Patent LR 4-3 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Damstedt, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 7, 2014 Filing 49 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 3, 2014 Filing 48 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Under Patent LR 4-3 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Damstedt, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
December 23, 2013 Filing 47 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 46 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File for Patent Local Rule 4-3 Deadline, filed by Apple, Inc., Technology Licensing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Damstedt, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/20/2013) Modified on 12/23/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 44 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement under Patent L.R. 4-3 filed by Apple, Inc., Technology Licensing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Damstedt, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 43 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 6, 2013 Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Patent L.R. 4-3) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Damstedt, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
November 18, 2013 Filing 41 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 15, 2013 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Case Schedule Pursuant to Case Management Order filed by Technology Licensing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Carpenter, John) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
October 30, 2013 Filing 39 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 25, 2013 Filing 38 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Make Document Production Accompanying Invalidity Contentions filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Teter, Timothy) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PRELIMINARY INVALIDITY CONTENTION DEADLINE by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 23, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Vidya Ratna Bhakar (Bhakar, Vidya) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 23, 2013 Filing 35 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File to File Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Damstedt, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 7, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by John Wade Carpenter Notice of Appearance of Charles J. Kulas (Carpenter, John) (Filed on 9/7/2013)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton finding as moot 31 Stipulation; granting 32 Stipulation (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Corrected Proposed Agreed Protective Order Regarding the Discovery and Use of Discovery Materials filed by Apple, Inc., Technology Licensing Company, Inc.. (Teter, Timothy) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Proposed) Agreed Protective Order Regarding the Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials filed by Apple, Inc., Technology Licensing Company, Inc.. (Teter, Timothy) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER PURSUANT TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 29 Stipulation.(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 7, 2013 Filing 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulated Case Schedule and [Proposed] Order Pursuant to Case Management Conference filed by Apple, Inc., Technology Licensing Company, Inc.. (Teter, Timothy) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
July 23, 2013 Filing 28 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session 7/22/2013 case not settled mediation complete. By Mediator, Shirish Gupta, dated 7/22/2013. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 8, 2013 Filing 27 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [Local Rule 16-9] and Fed. R. Civ. P 26(f) Report filed by Apple, Inc., Technology Licensing Company, Inc.. (Teter, Timothy) (Filed on 7/8/2013) Modified on 7/9/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 7/22/2013 09:30 AM., at Cooley, LLP101 California St., 5th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94111-5800. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 26 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Shrish Gupta as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 25 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/6/2013 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 6/6/2013). Claims Construction Hearing set for 3/12/2014 09:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 2/28/2014 09:00 AM. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/6/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Technology Licensing Company, Inc., Apple, Inc. (Carpenter, John) (Filed on 5/30/2013) Modified on 5/31/2013 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (MEDIATION) by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 22 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 20, 2013 Filing 22 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Apple, Inc. filed by Apple, Inc.. (Damstedt, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 20, 2013 Filing 21 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Damstedt, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 15, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Address by John Wade Carpenter (Carpenter, John) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 19 Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byApple, Inc.. (Teter, Timothy) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Carter Mace (Mace, Andrew) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
March 25, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin George Damstedt (Damstedt, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 25, 2013 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple, Inc. (Teter, Timothy) (Filed on 3/25/2013) Modified on 3/26/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2013 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Teter, Timothy) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 25, 2013 Filing 14 STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Apple, Inc.. (Teter, Timothy) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 25, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Teter (Teter, Timothy) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
February 12, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2013 02:00 PM. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 11 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
February 10, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue Initial CMC filed by Technology Licensing Company, Inc.. (Carpenter, John) (Filed on 2/10/2013)
February 6, 2013 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Technology Licensing Company, Inc.. (Carpenter, John) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/9/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/26/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2012) Modified on 12/27/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2012 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 21, 2012 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Technology Licensing Company, Inc... (Carpenter, John) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 7, 2012 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE To Plaintiff re: Consent or Declination. Form due by 12/21/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
December 4, 2012 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
December 3, 2012 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/1/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/8/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
December 3, 2012 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
December 3, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against Apple, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611081099). Filed by Technology Licensing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Technology Licensing Company, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Technology Licensing Company, Inc.
Represented By: John Wade Carpenter
Represented By: Daniel Remer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?