Woodruff v. Kia Motors America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Woodruff
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv06155
Filed: December 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) by The United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, MDL No. 2424. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Responsive Pleadings and Other Case Deadlines Pending Resolution of MDL Petition. Case stayed. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/20/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/12/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodruff v. Kia Motors America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Woodruff
Represented By: Deborah R Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Represented By: Vivian S Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?