Crosthwaite et al v. Giacalone Electrical Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre-Apprenticeship, Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Heavy and Highway Committee, F. G. Crosthwaite, Russell E. Burns and Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers
Defendant: Gilroy Construction Inc., Giacalone Design Services, Inc. and Giacalone Electrical Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv06178
Filed: December 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Re: Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment; Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Giacalone Electrical Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/21/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER : Further Case Management Conference set for 6/27/14 is continued to 9/12/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/9/14. Motions terminated: (52 in 3:13-cv-02338-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (45). (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 3/21/14 is continued to 6/27/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3.10/14., Motions terminated: (60 in 3:12-cv-06178-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (59) Clerks Notice, Stipulated Request To Continue Case Management Conference filed by F. G. Crosthwaite, Heavy and Highway Committee, Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre-Apprenticeship, Apprentice an d Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Russell E. Burns, Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Fund, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 of the International Union of Operat ing Engineers, AFL-CIO, (44 in 3:13-cv-02338-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (43) Clerks Notice, Stipulated Request To Continue Case Management Conference filed by Richard Piombo, Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Russell E. Burns. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER,Further Case Management Conference set for 1/17/14 is continued to 3/28/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/13/14. Motions terminated: 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [ 52] Case Management Conference - Further, Set Hearings,, Stipulated Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by F. G. Crosthwaite, Heavy and Highway Committee, Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre-Apprentices hip, Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Russell E. Burns, Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Fund, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Dismissal of Defendant Giacalone Design Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/8/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER, Motions terminated: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/9/13 is continued to 9/6/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/24/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 7/12/13 is continued to 8/9/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/13/13., Motions terminated: 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [26 ] Pretrial Order, 25 Case Management Conference - Initial, Set Hearings,, 30 Order on Stipulation Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Mediation Deadline and Case Management Conference filed by F. G. Crosthwaite, Heavy and H ighway Committee, Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre-Apprenticeship, Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Russell E. Burns, Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Fund, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 21 Motion to Appear by Telephone (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/10/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crosthwaite et al v. Giacalone Electrical Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre-Apprenticeship, Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heavy and Highway Committee
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. G. Crosthwaite
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell E. Burns
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilroy Construction Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giacalone Design Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giacalone Electrical Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?