Gametek LLC v. Gameview Studios, LLC
Plaintiff: Gametek LLC
Defendant: Gameview Studios, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv06184
Filed: December 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/2/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/25/2013 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 7/22/2013. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/20/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/16/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Markman hearing set for 11/6/2013 10:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 10/30/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/11/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gametek LLC v. Gameview Studios, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gametek LLC
Represented By: Johnathan Yazdani
Represented By: Stephen F. Schlather
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gameview Studios, LLC
Represented By: Han Xu
Represented By: Brandon H. Stroy
Represented By: Sasha G. Rao
Represented By: Hiroyuki Hagiwara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?