Reid v. Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York
Plaintiff: Stephen Reid
Defendant: Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York
Case Number: 3:2012cv06230
Filed: December 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Voluntary Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice filed by Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 9, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 25 Notice of Settlement filed by Stephen Reid. Dismissal or Statement due by 10/3/2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 20, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE-SETTING DEADLINE FOR COMPLETING INITIAL DISCLOSURES. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 7, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING PARTIES' STIPULATION SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 17 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 5, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN RESPONSE TO STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 15 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 28, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Reid
Represented By: Susan Borondia Grabarsky
Represented By: Lissa Anne Martinez
Represented By: Frank N. Darras
Represented By: Phillip S Bather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?