Bascom Research, LLC v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Bascom Research, LLC
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv06293
Filed: December 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2013 Filing 96 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/30/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 9/4/2013). Further Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 2/26/2014 03:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 2/19/2014 03:30 PM. (Court Reporter n/a.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/4/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 95 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Bascom Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Ledahl, Brian) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 19, 2013 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Lowell D. Mead (Mead, Lowell) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR REINSTATEMENT OF DATES UNDER PATENT LOCAL RULES 4-3 AND 4-4 113 in case 3:12-cv-06294-SI; 91 in case 3:12-cv-06293-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 92 RESPONSE (re 91 MOTION to Shorten Time To Reinstate Dates Pursuant To Patent Local Rule 4-3 and 4-4 ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 91 MOTION to Shorten Time To Reinstate Dates Pursuant To Patent Local Rule 4-3 and 4-4 filed by Bascom Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Brian D. Ledahl, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proposed Order)(Ledahl, Brian) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (109) MOTION to Vacate Administrative Motion to Vacate Pat. L.R. 4-3 and 4-4 Claim Construction Deadlines In Advance of August 30 CMC. ( Motion to Vacate in case 3:12-cv-06294-SI; granting (89) Motion to Vacate in case 3:12-cv-06293-SI) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 2, 2013 Filing 89 MOTION to Vacate Administrative Motion to Vacate PLR 4-3 and 4-4 Claim Construction Deadlines in Advance of August 30, 2013 Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. Responses due by 8/16/2013. Replies due by 8/23/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Michelle Ybarra, # 2 Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 87 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
July 31, 2013 Filing 87 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Bascom Research, LLC. Responses due by 8/14/2013. Replies due by 8/21/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hannah, James) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 31, 2013 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian David Ledahl , Marc Aaron Fenster, and Dorian Seawind Berger (Ledahl, Brian) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 29, 2013 Filing 85 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. of Disassociation of Counsel Brian Wikner (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/25/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 24, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 23, 2013 Filing 83 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/19/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 7/23/2013). Further Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2013 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter n/a.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/23/2013)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER RELATING CASES 12-6293, 12-6296, 12-6295, 13-2891 JCS. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/18/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 18, 2013 Filing 81 RESPONSE to 79 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related by Salesforce.com, Inc. (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 7/18/2013) Modified on 7/19/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2013 Filing 80 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Further Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Bascom Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Further Joint Case Management Conference Statement)(Hannah, James) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 12, 2013 Filing 79 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related to 12-6294 SI, 12-6295 SI, 13-2891 JCS filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Bajoria Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 7/12/2013) Modified on 7/15/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2013 Filing 78 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/27/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 6/28/2013). Further Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2013 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter n/a.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/28/2013)
June 26, 2013 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristopher Benjamin Kastens as Counsel for Plaintiff, Bascom Research, LLC (Kastens, Kristopher) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 21, 2013 Filing 76 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Michelle Ybarra, # 2 Exhibit A)(Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 21, 2013 Filing 75 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Bascom Research, LLC. (Hannah, James) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
April 12, 2013 Filing 74 Answer to Amended Complaint 73 Amended Complaint,, for Patent Infringement byFacebook, Inc.. (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
March 29, 2013 Filing 73 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Facebook, Inc. . Filed by Bascom Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X)(Hannah, James) (Filed on 3/29/2013) Modified on 3/29/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2013 Filing 72 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/15/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 3/19/2013). Further Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2013 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Markman hearing set for 10/2/2013 03:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 9/25/2013 03:30 PM. (Court Reporter n/a.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 20 in case 3:12-cv-06295-SI; 20 in case 3:12-cv-06297-SI; 24 in case 3:12-cv-06296-SI; 22 in case 3:12-cv-06294-SI; 22 in case 3:12-cv-06293-SI. If Bascom wishes to amend the complaints, Bascom shall do so by March 29, 2013. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/12/2013) Modified on 3/13/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2013 Filing 70 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Bascom Research, LLC. (Hannah, James) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
March 4, 2013 Filing 69 CLERKS NOTICE : All parties are directed to deliver courtesy copies of all motion and supporting documents to the Clerk's Office immediately.This is a docket text entry only. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
March 4, 2013 Filing 68 CLERKS NOTICE All motions to dismiss have been scheduled for argument on Friday March 15, 2013, at 9:00 a.m.. THIS IS A DOCKET TEXT ENTRY ONLY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (22 in 3:12-cv-06293-SI) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 12(B)(6): Failure to State a Claim, (22 in 3:12-cv-06294-SI) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Indirect Infringement Claims, (20 in 3:12-cv-06295-SI) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (24 in 3:12-cv-06296-SI) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (20 in 3:12-cv-06297-SI) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR, Motions terminated: 66 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Bascom Research, LLC filed by Bascom Research, LLC.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/1/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
February 27, 2013 Filing 66 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Bascom Research, LLC filed by Bascom Research, LLC. (Hannah, James) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 22, 2013 Filing 65 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hannah, James) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
February 7, 2013 Filing 64 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
February 7, 2013 Filing 63 CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RELATING CASE to 12-6294-EMC, 12-6295-SI, 12-6296-SI, 12-6297-RS., Motions terminated: 61 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED [L.R. 3-12, 7-11] filed by Bascom Research, LLC.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/24/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 23, 2013 Filing 61 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED [L.R. 3-12, 7-11] to 12-6294-EMC, 12-6295-SI, 12-6296-SI, 12-6297-RS filed by Bascom Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Relate Cases [L.R. 3-12, 7-11], # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hannah, James) (Filed on 1/23/2013) Modified on 1/24/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2013 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Graham Rhodes Notice of Appearance of Michael G. Rhodes as Counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 18, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Lee Stameshkin as Additional Counsel for Facebook, Inc. (Stameshkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/18/2013)
January 17, 2013 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Patrick Wikner Additional Counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. (Wikner, Brian) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
January 14, 2013 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Lee (Lee, Michael) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 11, 2013 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Thomas Norberg (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/11/13. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
January 10, 2013 Filing 54 NOTICE by Bascom Research, LLC of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings CORRECTION OF DOCKET NO. 50 (Hannah, James) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 10, 2013 Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 9, 2013 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Hannah (Hannah, James) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 9, 2013 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Kobialka (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 9, 2013 Filing 50 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 54 . *** NOTICE by Bascom Research, LLC Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 1/9/2013) Modified on 1/11/2013 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2013 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Andre (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 9, 2013 Filing 48 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bascom Research, LLC (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 9, 2013 Filing 47 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bascom Research, LLC.. (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 2, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi Lyn Keefe as Counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
January 2, 2013 Filing 45 CLERKS NOTICE REQUESTING PLAINTIFF FILE CONSENT OR DECLINATION. Admissions due by 1/16/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
December 31, 2012 Filing 44 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Facebook, Inc... (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/31/2012)
December 17, 2012 Filing 43 CLERKS NOTICE REQUESTING ALL PARTIES FILE CONSENT OR DECLINATION. Admissions due by 12/31/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 12, 2012 Filing 42 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 3/5/2013 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 3/12/2013 at 10:00 AM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
December 12, 2012 Filing 41 CASE TRANSFERRED in from United States District Court for the Easten District of Virginia-Alexandria Division; Case Number 1:12-cv-01111-LBM/JFA. Original File Certified Copy of Transfer Order & Docket Sheet Received.
December 12, 2012 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Accordingly, for the reasons stated in open court and set forth in this Order, Facebook's Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) [Dkt. No. 25] is GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that this civil action be and is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California.(see order for details) Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 12/11/12. (yguy)
December 11, 2012 Case transferred to District of Northern District of California. (yguy)
December 7, 2012 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held on 12/7/2012. Appearance of counsel. Deft 25 Joint MOTION to Change Venue is argued and GRANTED. (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy)
December 7, 2012 Filing 38 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for date of 12/7/2012, before Judge Brinkema, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 1/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/6/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2013.(thomson, anneliese)
November 29, 2012 Filing 37 Reply to Motion re 25 Joint MOTION to Change Venue filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Cole, Scott)
November 29, 2012 Filing 36 Reply to 22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 12(B)(6): Failure to State a Claim filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Cole, Scott)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 32 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/26/12. (klau, )
November 21, 2012 Filing 34 Memorandum in Opposition re 25 Joint MOTION to Change Venue filed by all Defendants in Related Cases filed by Bascom Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Thomas Bascom, # 2 Affidavit Will Rosellini, # 3 Affidavit Jonathan Caplan, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16)(Porter, William)
November 21, 2012 Filing 33 Memorandum in Opposition re 22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 12(B)(6): Failure to State a Claim filed by Bascom Research, LLC. (Porter, William)
November 20, 2012 Filing 32 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Patrick Wikner and Certification of Local Counsel Scott A Cole Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3293220. by Facebook, Inc.. (Cole, Scott)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/19/12. (nhall)
November 16, 2012 Filing 30 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth L. Stameshkin and Certification of Local Counsel Scott A. Cole Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3290247. by Facebook, Inc.. (Cole, Scott)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey T. Norberg. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/13/2012. (stas)
November 9, 2012 Filing 28 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey T. Norberg and Certification of Local Counsel Scott A. Cole Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3282639. by Facebook, Inc.. (Cole, Scott)
November 9, 2012 Set Deadlines as to 22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 12(B)(6): Failure to State a Claim, 25 Joint MOTION to Change Venue. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2012 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
November 8, 2012 Filing 27 Notice of Hearing Date 12/7/2012 re 25 Joint MOTION to Change Venue (Cole, Scott)
November 8, 2012 Filing 26 Memorandum in Support re 25 Joint MOTION to Change Venue filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brian Wikner Declaration, # 2 Jeremy Jordan Declaration, # 3 Shin-Yuan Tzou Declaration, # 4 Jim Lundberg Declaration, # 5 Avery Moon Declaration, # 6 William R. Pierznik Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 3, # 10 Exhibit 4, # 11 Exhibit 5, # 12 Exhibit 6, # 13 Exhibit 7, # 14 Exhibit 8, # 15 Exhibit 9, # 16 Exhibit 10, # 17 Exhibit 11, # 18 Exhibit 12, # 19 Exhibit 13, # 20 Exhibit 14, # 21 Exhibit 15, # 22 Exhibit 16, # 23 Exhibit 17, # 24 Exhibit 18, # 25 Exhibit 19, # 26 Exhibit 20, # 27 Exhibit 21, # 28 Exhibit 22, # 29 Exhibit 23, # 30 Exhibit 24, # 31 Exhibit 25, # 32 Exhibit 26, # 33 Exhibit 27, # 34 Exhibit 28, # 35 Exhibit 29, # 36 Exhibit 30, # 37 Exhibit 31, # 38 Exhibit 32, # 39 Exhibit 33, # 40 Exhibit 34, # 41 Exhibit 35, # 42 Exhibit 36, # 43 Exhibit 37, # 44 Exhibit 38, # 45 Exhibit 39, # 46 Exhibit 40, # 47 Exhibit 41, # 48 Exhibit 42, # 49 Exhibit 43, # 50 Exhibit 44, # 51 Exhibit 45, # 52 Exhibit 46, # 53 Exhibit 47, # 54 Exhibit 48, # 55 Exhibit 49, # 56 Exhibit 50, # 57 Exhibit 51, # 58 Exhibit 52, # 59 Exhibit 53, # 60 Exhibit 54, # 61 Exhibit 55, # 62 Exhibit 56, # 63 Exhibit 57)(Cole, Scott)
November 8, 2012 Filing 25 Joint MOTION to Change Venue by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cole, Scott)
November 8, 2012 Filing 24 Notice of Hearing Date set for 12/7/2012 re 22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 12(B)(6): Failure to State a Claim (Cole, Scott)
November 8, 2012 Filing 23 Brief in Support to 22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 12(B)(6): Failure to State a Claim filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Cole, Scott)
November 8, 2012 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 12(B)(6): Failure to State a Claim by Facebook, Inc.. (Cole, Scott)
November 8, 2012 Filing 21 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Facebook, Inc.. (Cole, Scott)
November 8, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Richard Smith on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Smith, Stephen)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/6/2012. (rban, )
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/6/2012. (rban, )
November 6, 2012 Filing 17 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark R. Weinstein and Certification of Local Counsel Scott Cole Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3274493. by Facebook, Inc.. (Cole, Scott)
November 6, 2012 Filing 16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Heidi Lyn Keefe and Certification of Local Counsel Scott Cole Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3274442. by Facebook, Inc.. (Cole, Scott)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Facebook, Inc. answer due 11/8/2012. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/25/2012. (rban, )
October 22, 2012 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cole, Scott)
October 22, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Allen Cole on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Cole, Scott)
October 12, 2012 Filing 12 Affidavit of Process Server/SUMMONS Returned Executed Facebook, Inc. served on 10/4/2012, answer due 10/25/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(nhall)
October 12, 2012 Filing 11 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Bascom Research, LLC. (Porter, William)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul Joseph Andre. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/9/2012. (stas)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lisa Kobialka. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/9/2012. (stas)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan S. Caplan. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/9/2012. (stas)
October 5, 2012 Filing 7 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s) 7,111,232, 7,139,974, 7,158,971, and 7.389,241. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(stas)
October 5, 2012 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul Joseph Andre and Certification of Local Counsel William B. Porter Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3235264. by Bascom Research, LLC. (Porter, William)
October 5, 2012 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lisa Kobialka and Certification of Local Counsel William B. Porter Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3235261. by Bascom Research, LLC. (Porter, William)
October 5, 2012 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan S. Caplan and Certification of Local Counsel William B. Porter Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3235252. by Bascom Research, LLC. (Porter, William)
October 5, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William Boyle Porter on behalf of Bascom Research, LLC (Porter, William)
October 3, 2012 Filing 2 Summons Issued and given to atty for service by SPS as to deft., Facebook, Inc. (stas)
October 3, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Facebook, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 14683031428), filed by Bascom Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Receipt, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Cover Letter)(stas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bascom Research, LLC v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bascom Research, LLC
Represented By: Paul J. Andre
Represented By: James R. Hannah
Represented By: John A.C. Keith
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Represented By: Michael H. Lee
Represented By: William Boyle Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Allen Cole
Represented By: Heidi Lyn Keefe
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Norberg
Represented By: Stephen Richard Smith
Represented By: Brian Patrick Wikner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?