Hatami v. Intel Corporation Long Term Disability Plan et al
Plaintiff: Parviz Hatami
Defendant: Intel Corporation Long Term Disability Plan and Reed Group, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2012cv06315
Filed: December 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Parviz Hatami. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/6/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED ORDER ALLOWING NANCY PRIDGEN TO APPEAR BY PHONE. LOCAL COUNSEL MUST APPEAR IN PERSON re 25 Order. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 3/29/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/26/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/5/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatami v. Intel Corporation Long Term Disability Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Group, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parviz Hatami
Represented By: Steven M. Chabre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?