Rosell et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Jon Rosell and Jane Rosell
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2012cv06321
Filed: December 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/3/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion to Dismiss (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 42 Case Management Conference - Further. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/28/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 26 Motion for Leave to File (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/30/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosell et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Rosell
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Represented By: Jessica Galleta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Rosell
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Represented By: Jessica Galleta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?