DGP Associates, LP v. American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: DGP Associates, LP
Defendant: James C. Jenkins Insurance Services, Inc., Jenkins/Athens Coverco Inc., American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company, American Zurich Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois and Jenkins Insurance Services
Case Number: 3:2012cv06348
Filed: December 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 5 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 19 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company. Zurich Defendant's sur-reply due 3/7/13. Motion hearing reset to 3/14/13 at 1:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/28/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/25/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DGP Associates, LP v. American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Jenkins Insurance Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenkins/Athens Coverco Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company
Represented By: Victor J. Jacobellis
Represented By: Jonathan Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Zurich Insurance Company
Represented By: Victor J. Jacobellis
Represented By: Jonathan Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Victor J. Jacobellis
Represented By: Jonathan Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Jonathan Gross
Represented By: Victor J. Jacobellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenkins Insurance Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DGP Associates, LP
Represented By: Joel Philip Gumbiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?