Cox v. General Mills, Inc.
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Cox
Defendant: General Mills, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv06377
Filed: December 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS by Judge Alsup granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS by Judge Alsup denying 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE re 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 17 Order on Stipulation Amended Stipulation re Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule filed by General Mills, Inc., Motions terminated: 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORD ER re 17 Order on Stipulation Amended Stipulation re Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule filed by General Mills, Inc.. Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2013. Motions due by 3/7/2013. Replies due by 4/4/2013. Responses due by 3/28/ 2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 11, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING STIPULATED EXTENSIONS by Hon. William Alsup denying 14 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. General Mills, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Cox
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Lopatin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Mills, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?