Grimes v. San Mateo County Transit District et al
Plaintiff: Carl Anthony Grimes
Defendant: San Mateo County Transit District, Michael J. Scanlon, Karambir Cheema, Said El-Khaitb, Sonja Higgins, Derrick Fisher, Art Gonzales, Bill Carson, Gigi Herington, William Snell and Sandy Wong
Case Number: 3:2012cv06381
Filed: December 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re #26 . The Clerk of the Court shall close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/9/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2013: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2013 Filing 26 STIPULATION For Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Bill Carson, Karambir Cheema, Said El-Khaitb, Derrick Fisher, Art Gonzales, Gigi Herington, Sonja Higgins, San Mateo County Transit District, Michael J. Scanlon, William Snell, Sandy Wong. (Atencio, Alexandra) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2013. Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/2/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 1, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE by Bill Carson, Karambir Cheema, Said El-Khaitb, Derrick Fisher, Art Gonzales, Gigi Herington, Sonja Higgins, San Mateo County Transit District, Michael J. Scanlon, William Snell, Sandy Wong NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; PROPOSED ORDER (Atencio, Alexandra) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 23 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE on May 9, 2013 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. A Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #14 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to Strike. All of Mr. Grimes's claims against the Individual Defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND, and the Mr. Grimes's third claim against the District for tortious discharge in violation of public policy is DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND as well. As for Mr. Grimes's first claim against the District for discrimination in violation of Title VII and his second claim against the District for harassment in violation of Title VII, the court DISMISSES them WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. His second claim against the District for retaliation in violation of Title VII SURVIVES. In addition, the court STRIKES Mr. Grimes's prayer for punitive damages against the District. Mr. Grimes shall file any First Amended Complaint no later than May 20, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/22/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2013: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2013 Filing 21 Declaration of Alexandra V.Atencio in Support of #20 Reply to Opposition/Response, To Motion To Dismiss And Strike Portions of, Plaintiff's Complaint filed byBill Carson, Karambir Cheema, Said El-Khaitb, Derrick Fisher, Art Gonzales, Gigi Herington, Sonja Higgins, San Mateo County Transit District, Michael J. Scanlon, William Snell, Sandy Wong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #20 ) (Atencio, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 12, 2013 Filing 20 REPLY (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion To Dismiss, And To Strike Portions of, Plaintiff's Complaint [FRCP 12(b)(6) and 12(f)] ) filed byBill Carson, Karambir Cheema, Said El-Khaitb, Derrick Fisher, Art Gonzales, Gigi Herington, Sonja Higgins, San Mateo County Transit District, Michael J. Scanlon, William Snell, Sandy Wong. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Atencio, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 11, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Marie O'Malley As Counsel For Defendants (O'Malley, Diane) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
April 8, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE REGARDING LEGAL HELP DESK, HANDBOOK FOR LITIGANTS WITHOUT A LAWYER, AND LEGAL STANDARDS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/8/2013. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Legal Help Flyer)(ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 8, 2013 Filing 16 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 5, 2013 Filing 18 RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion To Dismiss, And To Strike Portions of, Plaintiff's Complaint [FRCP 12(b)(6) and 12(f)] ) filed byCarl Anthony Grimes. (Attachments: #1 part 2)(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
March 27, 2013 Filing 15 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING TIME ONLY: Motion to Dismiss Hearing reset to 5/2/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 22, 2013 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion To Dismiss, And To Strike Portions of, Plaintiff's Complaint [FRCP 12(b)(6) and 12(f)] filed by Bill Carson, Karambir Cheema, Said El-Khaitb, Derrick Fisher, Art Gonzales, Gigi Herington, Sonja Higgins, San Mateo County Transit District, Michael J. Scanlon, William Snell, Sandy Wong. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 4/5/2013. Replies due by 4/12/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Atencio, Alexandra) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 22, 2013 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bill Carson, Karambir Cheema, Said El-Khaitb, Derrick Fisher, Art Gonzales, Gigi Herington, Sonja Higgins, San Mateo County Transit District, Michael J. Scanlon, William Snell, Sandy Wong.. (Atencio, Alexandra) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 13, 2013 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Bill Carson served on 3/8/2013, answer due 3/29/2013; Karambir Cheema served on 3/8/2013, answer due 3/29/2013; Said El-Khaitb served on 3/8/2013, answer due 3/29/2013; Derrick Fisher served on 3/8/2013, answer due 3/29/2013; Art Gonzales served on 3/8/2013, answer due 3/29/2013; Gigi Herington served on 3/8/2013, answer due 3/29/2013; Sonja Higgins served on 3/8/2013, answer due 3/29/2013; Michael J. Scanlon served on 3/8/2013, answer due 3/29/2013; William Snell served on 3/8/2013, answer due 3/29/2013; Sandy Wong served on 3/8/2013, answer due 3/29/2013. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 7, 2013 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to San Mateo County Transit District on 3/1/13 by Carl Anthony Grimes. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
March 1, 2013 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Bill Carson served on 3/1/2013, answer due 3/22/2013; Karambir Cheema served on 3/1/2013, answer due 3/22/2013; Said El-Khaitb served on 3/1/2013, answer due 3/22/2013; Derrick Fisher served on 3/1/2013, answer due 3/22/2013; Art Gonzales served on 3/1/2013, answer due 3/22/2013; Gigi Herington served on 3/1/2013, answer due 3/22/2013; Sonja Higgins served on 3/1/2013, answer due 3/22/2013; San Mateo County Transit District served on 3/1/2013, answer due 3/22/2013; Michael J. Scanlon served on 3/1/2013, answer due 3/22/2013; William Snell served on 3/1/2013, answer due 3/22/2013; Sandy Wong served on 3/1/2013, answer due 3/22/2013. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
February 27, 2013 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Bill Carson, Karambir Cheema, Said El-Khaitb, Derrick Fisher, Art Gonzales, Gigi Herington, Sonja Higgins, San Mateo County Transit District, Michael J. Scanlon, William Snell, Sandy Wong. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 SMC Transit District, #2 USM 285 Scanlon, #3 USM 285 Cheema, #4 USM 285 El Khaitb, #5 USM 285 Higgins, #6 USM 285 Fisher, #7 USM 285 Gonzales, #8 USM 285 Carson, #9 USM 285 Herington, #10 USM 285 Snell, #11 USM 285 Wong)(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis and ORDER CONTINUING the initial case management conference. The Clerk of Court shall issue the summons. Furthermore, the U.S. Marshal for the Northern District of California shall serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the complaint, any amendments or attachments, Plaintiffs affidavit and this order upon Defendants. Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/25/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2013: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2013 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Carl Anthony Grimes. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order GRANTING #3 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler 01/14/2013.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2013: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2013 Filing 5 ***SECOND***CLERKS NOTICE re Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reasignment to a United States District Judge due 1/18/2013. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
December 19, 2012 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE re Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge due 1/4/2013. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 17, 2012 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carl Anthony Grimes. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012) (farS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2012 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 17, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against San Mateo County Transit District. Demand For Jury Trial. Filed byCarl Anthony Grimes. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2012: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4, #4 part 5, #5 part 6) (farS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes v. San Mateo County Transit District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Anthony Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Mateo County Transit District
Represented By: Alexandra V. Atencio
Represented By: Diane Marie O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Scanlon
Represented By: Alexandra V. Atencio
Represented By: Diane Marie O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karambir Cheema
Represented By: Alexandra V. Atencio
Represented By: Diane Marie O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Said El-Khaitb
Represented By: Alexandra V. Atencio
Represented By: Diane Marie O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonja Higgins
Represented By: Alexandra V. Atencio
Represented By: Diane Marie O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Fisher
Represented By: Alexandra V. Atencio
Represented By: Diane Marie O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Gonzales
Represented By: Alexandra V. Atencio
Represented By: Diane Marie O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Carson
Represented By: Alexandra V. Atencio
Represented By: Diane Marie O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gigi Herington
Represented By: Alexandra V. Atencio
Represented By: Diane Marie O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Snell
Represented By: Alexandra V. Atencio
Represented By: Diane Marie O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Wong
Represented By: Alexandra V. Atencio
Represented By: Diane Marie O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?