Jimenez v. The Westin St. Francis Hotel et al
Plaintiff: Andres Jimenez
Defendant: The Westin St. Francis Hotel, Bourbon Steak and Michael Judge
Case Number: 3:2012cv06411
Filed: December 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING 32 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 11/6/2013. ***Civil Case Terminated.***(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 30 Stipulation selecting Mediation (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss; denying 18 Motion to Strike (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines Schedule filed by Andres Jimenez Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2013 03:15 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/4/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/26/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez v. The Westin St. Francis Hotel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Jimenez
Represented By: John Houston Scott
Represented By: Lizabeth N. de Vries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Westin St. Francis Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bourbon Steak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?