Farrow et al v. Lipetzky
Plaintiff: John Farrow and Jerome Wade
Defendant: Robin Lipetzky
Case Number: 3:2012cv06495
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 126 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; denying 125 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting 128 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER directing Clerk to close file. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on August 30, 2013. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 56 Motion to Dismiss. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 6 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing complaint with leave to amend. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING re 37 Letter filed by Robin Lipetzky for an extension of one week to submit joint letter on ADR process. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/22/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO FILE STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/16/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farrow et al v. Lipetzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Farrow
Represented By: Michael Emery Dietrick
Represented By: Christopher Alan Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Wade
Represented By: Michael Emery Dietrick
Represented By: Christopher Alan Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Lipetzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?