Mosier v. Central Intelligence Agency
Plaintiff: Phillip Mosier
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Case Number: 3:2012cv06527
Filed: December 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE., Motions terminated: 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Phillip Mosier, 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or Alternatively, for Summary Judgment filed by Central Intelligence Agency.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/15/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/29/13 is continued to 5/3/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/26/13., Motions terminated: 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Phillip Mosier.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosier v. Central Intelligence Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Mosier
Represented By: Avner David Sofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?