Parks v. United States Government
Plaintiff: Lawanda Parks
Defendant: United States Government
Case Number: 3:2013cv00001
Filed: January 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/19/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Status Conference filed by United States of America Status Report due by 7/3/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/27/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Agreement of Compromise and Settlement and [Proposed] Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/7/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/25/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation (to be completed by 12/20/13). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/1/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013) Modified on 8/2/2013 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/2/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/31/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/26/13 is continued to 6/21/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/15/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parks v. United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawanda Parks
Represented By: Allan Merle Tabor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?