Doe v. Samuel Merritt University et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: California School of Podiatric Medicine and Samuel Merritt University
Case Number: 3:2013cv00007
Filed: January 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 59 Joint Stipulation Continuing Dispositive Motion Briefing Schedule filed by Samuel Merritt University. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/4/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/23/2013. ***The date of the pretrial conference is reset for 3/20/2014***(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013) Modified on 8/23/2013 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/9/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Magsitrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 27 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document and granting 30 Motion TO PROCEED USING A FICTITIOUS NAME (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/4/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT; RESCHEDULING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISSOLVE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/18/2013 at 09:00 AM, Courtroom F, 15th Floor in San Francisco. Show Cause Response due by 4/4/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/21/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 6 Motion to Dismiss (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Samuel Merritt University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California School of Podiatric Medicine
Represented By: Alex Hernaez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Merritt University
Represented By: Tyreen Grissel Torner
Represented By: Alex Hernaez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Talia Bari Saypoff
Represented By: David J. Millstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?