Thompson v. GenOn Energy Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Thompson
Defendant: GenOn Energy, Inc., Michael Montany, GenOn Delta, LLC, GenOn Energy Services, LLC and Carl Balke
Case Number: 3:2013cv00187
Filed: January 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson Granting 12 Motion to Remand; finding as moot 11 Motion to Dismiss (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re March 4 Hearing re 12 MOTION to Remand filed by Dennis Thompson (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER vacating hearing and briefing schedule on 11 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/31/2013. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. GenOn Energy Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GenOn Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Alexa L Woerner
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Montany
Represented By: Alexa L Woerner
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GenOn Delta, LLC
Represented By: Alexa L Woerner
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GenOn Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Alexa L Woerner
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Balke
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Represented By: Alexa L Woerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Thompson
Represented By: Felicia C. Curran
Represented By: Alberta Maureen Blumin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?