Goedde v. Shamama et al
Plaintiff: Kim Goedde
Defendant: Jack Shamama, Fauxjob Industries and Michael Stabile
Case Number: 3:2013cv00195
Filed: January 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Show Cause Response due by 9/27/2013. Dismissal due by 9/27/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 10, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 25 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held, case settled. Dismissal or Statement due by 9/9/2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 12, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re 20 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Michael Stabile. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 6, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 1, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/22/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goedde v. Shamama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Goedde
Represented By: Erin Dennis Vivion
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Rodenbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Shamama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fauxjob Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Stabile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?