Matuk v. Hoshino
Defendant: Martin Hoshino
Petitioner: Ruben Matuk
Case Number: 3:2013cv00204
Filed: January 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Presiding Judge: PSLC JNE
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 36 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 37 Motion for Reconsideration. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RE HABEAS PETITION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/29/2015. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order awarding fees and costs. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/25/2014. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/21/14. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE BRIEFS TO CALIFORNIA COURT OF APPEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/13/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/10/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL; GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME; INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK by Judge William Alsup granting 7 Stipulation; denying 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matuk v. Hoshino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ruben Matuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Hoshino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?