MEI 3D, LLC v. Gunnar Optiks LLC
Plaintiff: MEI 3D, LLC
Defendant: Gunnar Optiks LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00215
Filed: January 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/9/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/7/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/21/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEI 3D, LLC v. Gunnar Optiks LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEI 3D, LLC
Represented By: Anne Marie Rogaski
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gunnar Optiks LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?