GeoTag, Inc. v. Zoosk, Inc.
Plaintiff: Geotag, Inc.
Defendant: Zoosk, Inc.
Miscellaneous: David Keyzer
Case Number: 3:2013cv00217
Filed: January 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 225 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS AND COUNTERCLAIMS filed by Geotag, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/22/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 224 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 223 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND STAY OF CASE filed by Geotag, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/28/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 220 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS CO-COUNSEL, MALOUF & NOCKELS, LLP, AND REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES filed by Geotag, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/10/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 218 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND STAY OF CASE filed by Geotag, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/6/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2014. Further Case Management Conference reset for 10/9/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/29/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 212 Stipulation filed by Zoosk, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/20/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 183 Defendant's Motion to Require an Undertaking. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER GRANTING re 186 MOTION to Limit Claim Construction Briefing filed by Geotag, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/21/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Re GeoTag's Motion to Limit Claim Construction Briefing (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 AMENDED ORDER re 172 Stipulation and Order. Tutorial 4/14/14 at 2:30 p.m. Claims Construction 4/28/14 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/18/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 172 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 170 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [JOINT] FOR EXTENSION OF REMAINING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DEADLINES filed by Zoosk, Inc. Claims Construction Hearing reset for 4/28/2014 02:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing reset for 4/14/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/17/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 163 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF REMAINING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DEADLINES filed by Zoosk, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 2/3/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2 014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 2/10/2014 02:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 1/27/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/2/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Discovery Order re September 16 and 17 Joint Letters [153, 159]. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/18/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 150 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for 30-Day Extension of Remaining Claim Construction Deadlines filed by Zoosk, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 12/2/2013 02:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 11/18/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER REFERRING MOTION #139 TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARIA-ELENA JAMES FOR RESOLUTION. 8/29/13 HEARING BEFORE JUDGE CHEN IS VACATED.. Signed by Judge Edward M.Chen on 7/29/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 141 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER MTN RE SCHEDULE TO SUPPLEMENT INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS filed by Geotag, Inc., Set/Reset Responses due by 7/15/2013. Replies due by 7/22/2013. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/8/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 134 filed by Zoosk, Inc., Geotag, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/9/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 132 Letter filed by Zoosk, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2013. Further Case Management Conference reset for 10/29/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/29/2013 02:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 10/16/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/2/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STANDING ORDER (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER setting Case Management Conference for 2/13/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 1/17/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GeoTag, Inc. v. Zoosk, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geotag, Inc.
Represented By: David R Bennett
Represented By: Daniel S. Mount
Represented By: Kevin Martin Pasquinelli
Represented By: Keith Bryan Smiley
Represented By: Charles Craig Tadlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoosk, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Edwin Lahti
Represented By: Kathleen Lu
Represented By: Charlene Marie Morrow
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Premo
Represented By: Hector J. Ribera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: David Keyzer
Represented By: David Michael Keyzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?