The Board of Trustees et al v. Valley Utility Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees and Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Valley Utility Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00271
Filed: January 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:185 Employee Pension Plan
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 19 Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/2/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/28/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Board of Trustees et al v. Valley Utility Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Utility Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?