Pitre v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Ricky or Lorraine Pitre
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Northwest Trustee Services
Case Number: 3:2013cv00552
Filed: February 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order by Hon. William Alsup denying 39 Motion to Amend/Correct ;.(whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 54 Notice (Other) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/3/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 THIRD ORDER HOLDING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT IN ABEYANCE AND SETTING FURTHER HEARING DATE re 39 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Motion and To Amend The Complaint filed by Lorraine Pitre. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/21/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER HOLDING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT IN ABEYANCE AND SETTING FURTHER HEARING DATE [re 39 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Motion and To Amend The Complaint filed by Lorraine Pitre]. Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Wells Fargo is hereby Ordered to produce a Wells Fargo officer knowledgeable about Wells Fargos loan modification process and the specific facts of plaintiffs loan modification application(s) to be present and testify at the August 15 hearing. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/1/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE RE MEETING REPORT re 35 Status Report filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE by Hon. William Alsup [denying 26 Motion to Appear by Telephone].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/26/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitre v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Gurinder Singh Grewal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky or Lorraine Pitre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?