Shin et al v. NDEX West LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sang Eun Shin and Yong Shin
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage, NDEX West LLC, World Savings Bank, FSB and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Case Number: 3:2013cv00579
Filed: February 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JUDGMENT in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/18/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 4/17/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/5/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO DETERMINE IF CASES ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/26/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shin et al v. NDEX West LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage
Represented By: Kenneth Allen Franklin
Represented By: Christopher Alan Carr
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Allen Franklin
Represented By: Christopher Alan Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings Bank, FSB
Represented By: Christopher Alan Carr
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Represented By: Kenneth Allen Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Christopher Alan Carr
Represented By: Kenneth Allen Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sang Eun Shin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yong Shin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?