Parker v. J.M. Smucker Co.
Plaintiff: Diana Parker
Defendant: J.M. Smucker Co.
Not Classified By Court: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00690
Filed: February 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/22/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 21, 2015 Filing 76 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(II) filed by Diana Parker. (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Hon. Samuel Conti no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/3/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on December 18, 2014. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2014).
December 12, 2014 Filing 73 ERRATA re #72 Declaration in Support Notice of Errata re Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Class Certification by Diana Parker. (Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 12, 2014 Filing 72 Declaration of Diana Parker in Support of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byDiana Parker. (Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 71 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byJ.M. Smucker Co.. (Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #68 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #64 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 24, 2014 Filing 68 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration of Kenneth K. Lee in Support of Smucker's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by J.M. Smucker Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kenneth K. Lee, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Supplemental Declaration of Kenneth K. Lee in Support of Smucker's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Redacted), #4 Exhibit A (Redacted), #5 Exhibit B (Redacted), #6 Supplemental Declaration of Kenneth K. Lee in Support of Smucker's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B)(Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 23, 2014 Filing 67 Declaration of William G. Harris in Support of #64 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration of Theodore Maya in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Exhibit A Thereto filed byDiana Parker. (Related document(s) #64 ) (Maya, Theodore) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
October 22, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE by Diana Parker re PROOF OF SERVICE ON NON-PARTY PER L.R. 79-5(e) (Maya, Theodore) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting #60 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2014).
October 20, 2014 Filing 64 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration of Theodore Maya in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Exhibit A Thereto filed by Diana Parker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theodore Maya in Support of Administrative Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Supplemental Declaration of Theodore Maya in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, #4 Unredacted Version of Supplemental Declaration of Theodore Maya in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification with Exhibit A Thereto)(Maya, Theodore) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 20, 2014 Filing 63 CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Hearing. The Motion Hearing, which has been noticed for Friday, 10/24/2014, will be decided on papers submitted without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing is hereby VACATED. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 62 NOTICE by Diana Parker re PROOF OF SERVICE ON NON-PARTY PER L.R. 79-5(e) (Maya, Theodore) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 24, 2014 Filing 61 EXHIBITS A, C-F to Declaration of Theodore Maya in Support of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byDiana Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F)(Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 24, 2014 Filing 60 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 Certain Documents Submitted in Support of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed by Diana Parker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy G. Blood in Support of Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Seal, #3 REDACTED VERSION OF Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #4 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #5 REDACTED VERSION OF Declaration of Theodore Maya, #6 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Declaration of Theodore Maya, #7 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Exhibit B to Maya Declaration)(Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #57 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
August 27, 2014 Filing 58 Declaration of Kenneth K. Lee in Support of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed byJ.M. Smucker Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 22, #21 Exhibit 25, #22 Exhibit 26, #23 Exhibit 28, #24 Exhibit 29, #25 Exhibit 30, #26 Exhibit 31, #27 Exhibit 32, #28 Exhibit 33, #29 Exhibit 34, #30 Exhibit 35, #31 Exhibit 36, #32 Exhibit 37, #33 Exhibit 38, #34 Exhibit 39, #35 Exhibit 40, #36 Exhibit 41, #37 Exhibit 42, #38 Exhibit 43, #39 Exhibit 45, #40 Exhibit 47, #41 Exhibit 48, #42 Exhibit 50, #43 Exhibit 51, #44 Exhibit 52, #45 Exhibit 53)(Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
August 27, 2014 Filing 57 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by J.M. Smucker Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kenneth K. Lee, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #4 Redacted Version of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #5 Exhibit Sealed Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Sealed Version of Exhibit 21, #7 Exhibit Sealed Version of Exhibit 23, #8 Exhibit Sealed Version of Exhibit 24, #9 Exhibit Sealed Version of Exhibit 27, #10 Exhibit Sealed Version of Exhibit 44, #11 Exhibit Sealed Version of Exhibit 46, #12 Exhibit Sealed Version of Exhibit 49, #13 Exhibit Sealed Version of Exhibit 54)(Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Hearing on Motion to Certify Class. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #53 MOTION to Certify Class. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 08/21/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 20, 2014 Filing 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #53 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Hearing Date on Motion for Class Certification filed by Diana Parker. (Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 18, 2014 Filing 54 EXHIBITS Exhibit 12 to the Declaration of Tina Wolfson in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed byDiana Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14 to the Declaration of Tina Wolfson in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)(Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 18, 2014 Filing 53 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof filed by Diana Parker. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 8/27/2014. Replies due by 9/24/2014. (Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #51 Stipulation Continuing Briefing Deadlines and Page Limitations.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 8, 2014 Filing 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Certification Briefing Deadlines and Extending Page Limitations filed by J.M. Smucker Co.. (Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part #42 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 11, 2014 Filing 49 Declaration of Kenneth K. Lee in Support of #42 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 Certain Documents Submitted in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed byJ.M. Smucker Co.. (Related document(s) #42 ) (Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting in Part #42 Motion to File Under Seal and ORDER for Defendant to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 7/9/14. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014) Modified on 7/10/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. re #42 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 Certain Documents Submitted in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Notice) OF LODGING OF WALMARTS SUBMISSION UNDER LOCAL RULE 79-5(E)(1) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Naomi Beer)(Herrington, Robert) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
June 30, 2014 Filing 46 Declaration of Sara Gilbert in Support of #42 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 Certain Documents Submitted in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification REGARDING SEALING OF TARGET'S DATA filed byDiana Parker. (Related document(s) #42 ) (Maya, Theodore) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
June 30, 2014 Filing 45 Declaration of Diana Parker in Support of #42 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 Certain Documents Submitted in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Declaration of Diana Parker in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (signed version) [042-12] filed byDiana Parker. (Related document(s) #42 ) (Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
June 27, 2014 Filing 44 Declaration of Brian Bethke in Support of #42 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 Certain Documents Submitted in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification REGARDING SEALING OF ALBERTSON'S DATA filed byDiana Parker. (Related document(s) #42 ) (Maya, Theodore) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 26, 2014 Filing 43 NOTICE by Diana Parker re PROOF OF SERVICE ON NON-PARTIES PER L.R. 79-5(e) (Maya, Theodore) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 25, 2014 Filing 42 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 Certain Documents Submitted in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Diana Parker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy G. Blood in Support of Administrative Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #3 REDACTED VERSION OF Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #4 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Moton for Class Certification, #5 Declaration of Timothy G. Blood in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, #6 Exhibit 1 to Blood Decl. - BHO Firm Resume, #7 Declaration of Dr. Warren J. Keegan in Support of Plaintiff's Motino for Class Certification, #8 Exhibit 1 to Keegan Decl. - About Keegan & Co., #9 Exhibit 2 to Keegan Decl. - Publications, #10 Exhibit 3 to Keegan Decl. - Testimonial Experience, #11 Exhibit 4 to Keegan Decl. - Documents Considered, #12 Declaration of Diana Parker in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, #13 Declaration UNREDACTED VERSION OF Tina Wolfson in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, #14 UNREDACTED VERSION of Ex. 1 to Wolfson Decl - food labels survey, #15 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 2 to Wolfson Decl - govt data, #16 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 3 to Wolfson Decl - interrogatory responses, #17 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 4 to Wolfson Decl - Volker depo excerpts, #18 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 5 to Wolfson Decl - Floyd depo excerpts, #19 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 6 to Wolfson Decl - Boyce depo excerpts, #20 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 7 to Wolfson Decl - relevant portions of depo Ex. 3, #21 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 8 to Wolfson Decl - relevant portions of depo Ex. 4, #22 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 9 to Wolfson Decl - depo Ex. 5, #23 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 10 to Wolfson Decl - depo Ex. 6, #24 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 11 to Wolfson Decl - relevant portions of depo Ex. 8, #25 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 12 to Wolfson Decl - depo Ex. 11, #26 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 13 to Wolfson Decl - depo Ex. 17, #27 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 14 to Wolfson Decl - depo Ex. 22, #28 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 15 to Wolfson Decl - depo Ex. 26, #29 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 16 to Wolfson Decl - depo Ex. 32, #30 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 17 to Wolfson Decl - relevant portions of depo Ex. 34, #31 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 18 to Wolfson Decl - Albertsons LLC data, #32 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 19 to Wolfson Decl - Target data, #33 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 20 to Wolfson Decl - Bogenshutz, #34 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 21 to Wolfson Decl - Walmart letter, #35 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 22 to Wolfson Decl - corresp with Safeway, #36 Declaration REDACTED VERSION OF Declaration of Tina Wolfson in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, #37 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 1 to Wolfson Decl - food labels survey, #38 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 2 to Wolfson Decl - govt data, #39 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 3 to Wolfson Decl - interrogatory responses, #40 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 4 to Wolfson Decl - Volker depo excerpts, #41 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 5 to Wolfson Decl - Floyd depo excerpts, #42 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 6 to Wolfson Decl - Boyce depo excerpts, #43 REDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 7 to Wolfson Decl, #44 REDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 8 to Wolfson Decl, #45 REDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 9 to Wolfson Decl, #46 REDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 10 to Wolfson Decl, #47 REDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 11 to Wolfson Decl, #48 REDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 12 to Wolfson Decl, #49 REDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 13 to Wolfson Decl, #50 REDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 14 to Wolfson Decl, #51 REDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 15 to Wolfson Decl, #52 REDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 16 to Wolfson Decl, #53 REDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 17 to Wolfson Decl, #54 REDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 18 to Wolfson Decl, #55 REDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 19 to Wolfson Decl, #56 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 20 to Wolfson Decl - Bogenshutz Decl, #57 REDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 21 to Wolfson Decl, #58 UNREDACTED VERSION OF Ex. 22 to Wolfson Decl - corresp with Safeway, #59 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)(Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CERTIFICATION BRIEFING AND HEARING DATES. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 05/28/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CERTIFICATION BRIEFING AND HEARING DATES filed by Diana Parker. (Maya, Theodore) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CERTIFICATION BRIEFING AND HEARING DATES. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 03/26/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #35 Case Management Conference - Initial, Set Hearings,, TO CONTINUE CERTIFICATION BRIEFING AND HEARING DATES filed by Diana Parker. (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #36 Stipulation Governing the Designation and Handling of Confidential Materials.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 9, 2014 Filing 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Governing the Designation and Handling of Confidential Materials filed by J.M. Smucker Co.. (Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
November 25, 2013 Filing 35 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/22/2013 before Judge Samuel Conti. Hearing date and schedule set for Motion to Certify Class. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce) (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/25/2013)
October 30, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert Ahdoot for Ahdoot & Wolfson, PC (Ahdoot, Robert) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
September 27, 2013 Filing 33 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byJ.M. Smucker Co.. (Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 24, 2013 Filing 32 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Case Management Conference previously set for 09/27/2013. Case Management Statement due by 11/15/2013. Case Management Conference set for 11/22/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 31 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Diana Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 3, 2013 Filing 30 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Amended Class Action Complaint filed by J.M. Smucker Co.. (Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti denying #20 Motion to Dismiss.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 16, 2013 Filing 28 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byDiana Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #22 ) (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
August 7, 2013 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Hearing. The Motion Hearing, which has been noticed for Friday, 08/09/2013, will be decided on papers submitted without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing is hereby VACATED. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
July 31, 2013 Filing 26 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byJ.M. Smucker Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #24 ) (Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 31, 2013 Filing 25 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 26, 2013 Filing 24 REPLY (re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ) filed byJ.M. Smucker Co.. (Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 12, 2013 Filing 23 Plaintiff's Objections to #21 Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byDiana Parker. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 7/12/2013) Modified on 7/15/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2013 Filing 22 RESPONSE (re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ) Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed byDiana Parker. (Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
June 17, 2013 Filing 21 Request for Judicial Notice re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed byJ.M. Smucker Co.. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 17, 2013 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by J.M. Smucker Co.. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 7/12/2013. Replies due by 7/26/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference and Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 06/04/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 4, 2013 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing CMC and Setting Briefing Schedule filed by J.M. Smucker Co.. (Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
May 17, 2013 Filing 17 STIPULATION Enlarging Time to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by J.M. Smucker Co.. (Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 13, 2013 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against J.M. Smucker Co.. Filed byDiana Parker. (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
April 22, 2013 Filing 15 Request for Judicial Notice re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed byJ.M. Smucker Co.. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 22, 2013 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by J.M. Smucker Co.. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 5/6/2013. Replies due by 5/13/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 4, 2013 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE on Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Samuel Conti for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/3/13. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
April 3, 2013 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
April 2, 2013 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by J.M. Smucker Co... (Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order, signed 3/25/13, by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Dean Panos.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 21, 2013 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice / Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7568363.) filed by J.M. Smucker Co.. (Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/21/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 20, 2013 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE To All Counsel re: Consent or Declination. Form due by 4/3/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 19, 2013 Filing 5 STIPULATION ENLARGING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by J.M. Smucker Co.. (Lee, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
March 12, 2013 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint (Dkt 1), Civil Cover Sheet (Dkt 1-1), Summons (Dkt 2), Order Setting Initial CMC and ADR Deadlines (Dkt 3), and ECF Handout served on Sandy Tarver, Corporate Operations Specialist for CT Corporation System, Registered Agent for Defendant J.M. Smucker Co. on 03/01/2013, filed by Diana Parker. (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
February 15, 2013 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 15, 2013 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to J.M. Smucker Co.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 15, 2013 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against J.M. Smucker Co. (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611083304). Filed by Diana Parker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. J.M. Smucker Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Parker
Represented By: Timothy G. Blood
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Represented By: Theodore W. Maya
Represented By: Leslie E. Hurst
Represented By: Robert Ahdoot
Represented By: Theodore Walter Maya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M. Smucker Co.
Represented By: Kenneth Kiyul Lee
Represented By: Dean N. Panos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Robert James Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?