Walker & Zanger, Inc. v. La Castellon Tile & Stone, Inc. et al

Defendant: La Castellon, Inc. and La Castellon Tile & Stone, Inc.
Plaintiff: Walker & Zanger, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00774
Filed: February 21, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/2/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 20, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/20/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
April 24, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CONSENT JUDGMENT REQUEST (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker & Zanger, Inc. v. La Castellon Tile & Stone, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Castellon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Castellon Tile & Stone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walker & Zanger, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Friedman
Represented By: Brian French Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.