MCMEANS v. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY et al

Defendant: General Electric Company
Plaintiff: SUNDIATA SOULBEFREE
Case Number: 3:2013cv00937
Filed: March 1, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2016 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE re Voluntary Dismissal Of Entire Action, Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/26/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 1, 2016 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC AND PLAINTIFFS REGARDING STATUS OF SETTLEMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/1/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
March 11, 2013 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL. The above-titled case is referred to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer for consideration of whether the case is related to Murray, et al., v. General Electric Company, et al., No. C. 08-4461 CRB. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 11, 2013. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCMEANS v. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: CHARLES T. SHELDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUNDIATA SOULBEFREE
Represented By: KIMBERLY J.W.J. CHU
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Represented By: Geoff Terrance Sloniker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?