Caovilla et al v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc. et al

Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Dawneen Pardini Caovilla and David Caovilla
Case Number: 3:2013cv01003
Filed: March 6, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Show Cause Response due by 4/25/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/17/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
May 1, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO APRIL 17, 2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/1/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
May 16, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 7 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
July 19, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Show Cause Response due by 7/29/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/19/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
August 2, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/2/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
March 20, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/20/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caovilla et al v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc.
Represented By: Kim Anh Bui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace
Represented By: Kim Anh Bui
Represented By: Keith David Yandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawneen Pardini Caovilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Caovilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.