Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America v. Nippon Express U.S.A., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Nippon Express U.S.A., Inc. and China Airlines, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01104
Filed: March 11, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR NIPPON EXPRESS U.S.A., INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, RE: 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 04/05/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
June 5, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST re 14 . Case Management Conference continued to 7/31/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/5/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
July 23, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/23/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America v. Nippon Express U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Konstantin Savransky
Represented By: Michael J. Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nippon Express U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Dennis A. Cammarano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Airlines, Ltd.
Represented By: Ivy Larsen Nowinski
Represented By: Jennifer J. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.