THX, Ltd. v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: THX, Ltd.
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01161
Filed: March 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting 34 Stipulation to Stay Litigation (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 23, 2013 Filing 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Litigation filed by THX, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric L. Wesenberg in Support of the Parties' Stipulation to Stay Litigation)(Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 15, 2013 Filing 33 Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/15/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 15, 2013 Filing 32 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/11/2013 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 10/15/2013). Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/19/2014 01:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 5/12/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/15/2013)
October 8, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REFERRING CASE to a randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for all Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/7/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 4, 2013 Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement and [Proposed] Order filed by THX, Ltd.. (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
August 26, 2013 Filing 29 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 26 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim byTHX, Ltd.. (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 1, 2013 Filing 28 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 by Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
August 1, 2013 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
August 1, 2013 Filing 26 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against THX, Ltd. byApple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
July 30, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Carol Capuyan (Capuyan, Christine) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 25, 2013 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by THX, Ltd. re 2 ADR Scheduling Order, 13 Certificate of Interested Entities, 5 Order, 3 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, 12 Amended Complaint, 14 Statement PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 25, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Liv Leila Herriot (Herriot, Liv) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Bryan S. Conley (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 24, 2013 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Bryan Conley ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7872353.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Conley, Bryan) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Nina S. Tallon (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 24, 2013 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Nina S. Tallon ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7870847.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Tallon, Nina) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 16 STIPULATION to Continue the Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/18/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
July 17, 2013 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THX, Ltd.. Apple, Inc. served on 7/11/2013, answer due 8/1/2013. (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 16, 2013 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue the Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn in Support of the Parties' Stipulation to Continue the Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 16, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Daniel Selwyn (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 11, 2013 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by THX, Ltd. (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 7/11/2013) Modified on 7/12/2013 (farS, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2013 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by THX, Ltd. PLAINTIFF THX LTD.'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-16 (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
July 11, 2013 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Apple, Inc. DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Filed by THX, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 7/11/2013) Modified on 7/12/2013 (farS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING 10 STIPULATION selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/9/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 5, 2013 Filing 10 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by THX, Ltd. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Selecting ADR Process filed by THX, Ltd.. (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 7/5/2013)
July 5, 2013 Filing 9 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 7/5/2013)
July 3, 2013 Filing 8 *** FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD. *** AMENDED COMPLAINT AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Apple, Inc.. Filed byTHX, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 7/3/2013) Modified on 7/3/2013 (fff, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/3/2013 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING 6 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Case Management Statement due by 7/19/2013. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/19/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/5/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
June 4, 2013 Filing 6 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES filed by Apple, Inc., THX, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric Wesenberg in support of Stipulation to Continue CMC)(Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/19/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
March 15, 2013 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2013 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611013343.). Filed byTHX, Ltd.. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013) (hdjS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2013: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hdjS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THX, Ltd. v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THX, Ltd.
Represented By: Kenneth John Halpern
Represented By: Christopher L. Kelley
Represented By: Wing H Liang
Represented By: Eric Lance Wesenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?