August 21, 2017 |
Filing
426
ORDER TO DEFENDANTS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY COURT SHOULD CONSIDER OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/21/17. Show Cause Response due by 8/25/2017.(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
|
June 8, 2017 |
Filing
406
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/8/17. Show Cause Response due by 6/16/2017.(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
|
August 1, 2016 |
Filing
347
ORDER GRANTING 346 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 343 MOTION to Decertify Class and/or Disqualify Jeffrey Wilens and Jeffrey Spencer. Responses due by 8/24/2016. Replies due by 8/31/2016. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/1/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
|
July 21, 2016 |
Filing
340
Discovery Order regarding Interrogatory number 13 and the timing of pending discovery. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
|
July 14, 2016 |
Filing
339
ORDER: Re 338 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Discovery Hearing set for 7/21/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/14/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
|
June 20, 2016 |
Filing
329
ORDER RESOLVING 326 Administrative Motion for Clarification or in the Alternative for Additional Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 20, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
|
June 9, 2016 |
Filing
325
ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler re: 308 and 314 . The court denies the motion for leave to depose Jeffrey Wilens. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
|
May 10, 2016 |
Filing
313
Amended Discovery Order. The attached order corrects a typographical error on page 5, line 8, and is otherwise unchanged. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
|
April 29, 2016 |
Filing
300
ORDER re sealing motion at ECF No. 262. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
|
April 8, 2016 |
Filing
290
ORDER ACCEPTING SUBSTITUTIONS OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/8/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
|
February 19, 2016 |
Filing
259
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING DISCOVERY DEADLINES. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2016. Discovery due by 8/31/2016. Expert Witness List due by 11/30/2016. Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/19/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
|
February 1, 2016 |
Filing
255
ORDER VACATING HEARING ON 227 MOTION to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/1/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
|
January 19, 2016 |
Filing
248
ORDER REQUIRING SUR-REPLIES RE 226 Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint and 227 Motion to Certify Class. Sur-Replies due by 1/25/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 19, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
|
January 13, 2016 |
Filing
247
ORDER re 245 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Order to Show Cause to Plaintiffs' Counsel. Supplemental Briefs due by 1/22/2016. Show Cause Response due by 1/22/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 13, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
|
January 7, 2016 |
Filing
244
ORDER GRANTING: 242 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document The Money Mutual Defendants and Montel Williams CORRECTED Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document No. 229 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/7/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016) Modified on 1/7/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
|
January 6, 2016 |
Filing
243
ORDER GRANTING 241 Stipulation for Further Stay of Plaintiff Keeya Malone's Claims. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 6, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
|
October 1, 2015 |
Filing
225
ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 223 STIPULATION of the Parties Continuing Case Management Conference and Hearing on Class Certification. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/26/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/1/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
|
May 20, 2015 |
Filing
198
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/20/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
|
April 21, 2015 |
Filing
194
ORDER REQUIRING FURTHER RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND REQUIRING RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT JOHNSON. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/21/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
|
April 8, 2015 |
Filing
186
ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, 178 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION BY DAVID JOHNSON; STAYING CLAIMS PENDING ARBITRATION; AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING KEEYA MALONES CLAIMS AGAINST JOHNSON. Show Cause Response due by 4/24/2015. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/8/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
|
February 19, 2015 |
Filing
175
ORDER LIFTING CONDITIONAL SEAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/19/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
|
February 11, 2015 |
Filing
173
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2015. Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/11/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
|
February 9, 2015 |
Filing
172
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ADDRESSING ENTRY OF PARTIAL JUDGMENT; AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2015. Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/9/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
|
January 15, 2015 |
Filing
161
ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION FROM CANE BAY DEFENDANTS ON MOTIONS TO SEAL AND WARNING RE FOOTNOTES. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/15/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
|
January 7, 2015 |
Filing
157
ORDER GRANTING 156 STIPULATION TO TRAIL START TIME ON ORAL ARGUMENT. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2015 09:45 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/7/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
|
January 5, 2015 |
Filing
155
NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/5/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
|
December 16, 2014 |
Filing
147
ORDER TAKING 144 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal UNDER ADVISEMENT AND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO RE-FILE DOCKET NO. 145. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/16/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
|
November 26, 2014 |
Filing
142
ORDER REGARDING 137 THE PARTIES' JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER DATED NOVEMBER 24, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/26/2014.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
|
September 23, 2014 |
Filing
132
ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/23/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
|
September 2, 2014 |
Filing
128
ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/2/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
|
July 21, 2014 |
Filing
121
ORDER RE COVER LETTER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/21/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
|
July 2, 2014 |
Filing
116
ORDER REQUIRING CHAMBERS COPIES RE: 48 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6), 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 64 MOTION to Dismiss, 72 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, 104 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/2/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
|
June 25, 2014 |
Filing
115
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND RESOLVING LETTER BRIEFS RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/25/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
|
May 23, 2014 |
Filing
108
Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 106 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal without prejudice.(vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
|
February 24, 2014 |
Filing
89
ORDER GRANTING 87 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIN TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/24/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
|
February 12, 2014 |
Filing
85
ORDER RE DECLARATION OF AARON SHOAF AND EXHIBITS THERETO. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/11/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
|
January 6, 2014 |
Filing
79
ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS ON 48 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Bank of America, N.A., 50 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Aaron Shoaf, Effective Marketing Solutions, LLC, and 64 Motion to Dismiss filed by Brian Rauch, Glenn McKay, Partner Weekly, LLC, TSS Acquisition Company, LLC, Selling Source, LLC, MoneyMutual, LLC, John Hashman, London Bay Capital, LLC, Montel Brian Anthony Williams. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 6, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
|
December 9, 2013 |
Filing
63
ORDER STRIKING OVERSIZED BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/9/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013) Modified on 12/9/2013 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
|
October 21, 2013 |
Filing
43
ORDER RE MOTION TO SEAL AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/21/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013) Modified on 10/21/2013 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/21/2013 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
|
October 11, 2013 |
Filing
39
ORDER TERMINATING MOTIONS IN LIGHT OF AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/11/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
|
October 1, 2013 |
Filing
36
ORDER GRANTING 33 Administrative Motion to Continue Case Management. Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/1/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
|
May 21, 2013 |
Filing
20
ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO REMAND AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/21/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
|
April 24, 2013 |
Filing
16
ORDER GRANTING 15 STIPULATION CONTINUING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/24/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
|
April 19, 2013 |
Filing
14
ORDER GRANTING 13 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/19/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013) Modified on 4/19/2013 (jswlc3, COURT STAFF).
|