Airwair International Ltd. v. Schultz et al

Plaintiff: Airwair International Ltd.
Defendant: Matthew K. Schultz and NPS (Shoes) Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01190
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/22/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
July 16, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO REOPEN FILE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 7/16/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
September 19, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE A JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 22, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
October 16, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 10/16/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
November 12, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh denying 30 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 13, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 11/13/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
December 11, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 50 (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/11/2014. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
March 23, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2015)
March 24, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/24/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
April 8, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/8/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
April 10, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SERVE DEFENDANTS AND FILE STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/10/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Airwair International Ltd. v. Schultz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Airwair International Ltd.
Represented By: Marcy J. Bergman
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Blazewicz
Represented By: Robert James Esposito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew K. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NPS (Shoes) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.