SAP America, Inc. v. Pi-Net International, Inc.

Plaintiff: SAP America, Inc.
Defendant: Pi-Net International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01248
Filed: March 19, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 82 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 82 Motion for Recusal.. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
April 22, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 71 Motion to Lift Stay; finding as moot 71 Motion for Leave to File Amended Counterclaim. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
July 29, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
May 10, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/10/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAP America, Inc. v. Pi-Net International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAP America, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M Beauchamp
Represented By: Jane Louise Froyd
Represented By: Tharan Gregory Lanier
Represented By: Michael Q. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pi-Net International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?